Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1029 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/10/2024

                    Page 1 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1029 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0597  
Rep. Bradley 
Sen. Baisley 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 10, 2024 
Postponed Indefinitely  
Alexa Kelly | 303-866-3469 
alexa.kelly@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROHIBIT FOREIGN OWNERSHIP OF AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill would have covered foreign persons from owning certain property interests in 
Colorado and requires that persons obtaining property ownership register with the 
Secretary of State. The Attorney General could have taken civil action for any 
violations. The bill would have increased state expenditures and workload on an 
ongoing basis and may have increased state and local revenue.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill would have required an appropriation of $194,156 to the 
Department of State.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. The bill was postponed indefinitely by 
the House State, Civic, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee on March 7, 2024; 
therefore, the impacts identified in this analysis do not take effect. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1029 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$194,156  $23,869  
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$10,616  $5,676  
 
Total Expenditures 	$204,772  $29,545  
 
Total FTE 	0.6 FTE 0.3 FTE 
Transfers  	- 	- 
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
   Page 2 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1029 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill prohibits nonresident foreign citizens, entities, or governments (covered foreign 
persons) of the People’s Republic of China, the Russian Federation, or any country that is on the 
U.S. Department of State’s list of state sponsors of terrorism, from acquiring a controlling 
ownership share (more than 50 percent) of agricultural land, mineral rights, or water rights.  
Any covered foreign person that acquires the controlling ownership share in a property interest 
before January 1, 2025, may retain the property interest, but is prohibited from acquiring any 
additional controlling ownership in a property interest after this date. If a controlling ownership 
interest is acquired, it must be sold or otherwise disposed within two years.  
Registration requirement. No later than March 1, 2025, or 60 days after acquiring any 
ownership of a property interest, a covered foreign person with an ownership share must 
register with the Secretary of State (SOS). The SOS may create rules to implement the 
registration requirements. If a covered foreign person fails to register with the SOS, they are 
subject to a penalty of up to $2,000, credited to the General Fund. 
Civil action and fines. The Attorney General must take civil action in the district court where the 
obtained property interest is located against any covered foreign person that is reasonably 
believed to violate the prohibition or not comply with the registration requirement. If the 
property interest is found to be acquired in violation of the law, the property interest reverts to 
the state. The State Treasurer must sell the property, with proceeds from the sale, minus any 
costs incurred by the state, returned to the covered foreign person, and any surplus transferred 
to the treasurer of the county, or counties, where the property interest is located. 
State Revenue 
The bill may increase state revenue from fines to the General Fund and fees to the Department 
of State Cash Fund, which are subject to TABOR. 
Fine revenue. The bill creates a penalty for failure to register with the SOS of up to $2,000, 
credited to the General Fund. This analysis assumes a high level of compliance and that any fine 
revenue increase will be minimal.  
Fee revenue. Colorado law requires legislative service agency review of measures which create 
or increase any fee collected by a state agency. Under current law, the SOS is authorized to 
adjust fees so that the revenue generated approximates its direct and indirect program costs. 
The SOS is primarily funded through business filing fees. To cover the costs described in the 
State Expenditures section below, fees may need to be raised to cover all or some of the costs of 
this bill. The fees affected and the actual amount of fee charges will be set administratively by 
the SOS based on cash fund balance, total program costs, and the estimated number of 
professional activities subject to fees. This revenue is subject to TABOR. 
   Page 3 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1029 
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases expenditures in SOS by approximately $205,000 in FY 2024-25 and 
approximately $30,000 in future years, paid from the Department of State Cash Fund. The bill 
may also increase expenditures in the Department of Law (DOL) and the Department of the 
Treasury (Treasury). Costs are shown in Table 2 and detailed below.  
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1029 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Secretary of State   
Personal Services 	$39,118  $23,485  
Operating Expenses 	$768  	$384  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670  	- 
Computer Programming 	$147,600 	-       
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$10,616  $5,676  
Total Cost $204,772  $29,545  
Total FTE 	0.6 FTE 0.3 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Secretary of State. The SOS will incur costs to create and administer a new application 
procedure to capture and store registration information. This registration system requires 
0.3 FTE in the Business and Licensing Division in FY 2024-25 only, and an ongoing addition of 
0.3 FTE in the Information Technology (IT) Division beginning in FY 2024-25. The work will 
include drafting forms, research for rulemaking, training SOS staff, and participating in the 
development and testing of the registration system. IT costs to develop and maintain the 
registration system are estimated at 1,200 hours at $123 per hour in FY 2024-25 only. 
Department of Law. The DOL may have an increase in expenditures to investigate and 
prosecute civil actions against property ownership violations. Any increase is not expected until 
FY 2025-26. The number of future cases of unlawful ownership is unknown and the expenditure 
impact on DOL, if any, will be addressed during the budget process. The department may also 
be required to assist in the promulgation of rules for the program.  
Treasury Department. Beginning FY 2025-26, if the DOL brings civil action against a property 
owner that results in property reverting to the state, Treasury must have a process to sell or 
dispose of that property and distribute proceeds to the covered foreign person. Treasury may 
retain a portion of sales to cover costs. Because this is a new responsibility for the department, 
the cost likely includes new staff; however, since the number of unlawful ownership cases is 
unknown, any increase in expenditures will be addressed during the budget process.   Page 4 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1029 
 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Local Government  
In cases where the state is required to sell property acquired from a covered foreign person, 
counties may receive an increase in revenue from the sale of property if any proceeds of a sale 
remain.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $194,156 from the Department of State 
Cash Fund to the Department of State, and 0.6 FTE.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Agriculture      Information Technology     Judicial    
Law       Local Affairs        Personnel   
Secretary of State    Treasury          Natural Resources 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.