Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1046 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/05/2024

                    Page 1 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1046 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0347  
Rep. Duran; Evans 
Sen. Kolker; Kirkmeyer 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 5, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 
aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov 
Bill Topic: CHILD WELFARE SYSTEM TOOLS 
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires that reports of child abuse include any evidence of domestic 
violence or intimate partner violence, the child abuse hotline have a disclaimer that 
calls are recorded, and the Child Protection Ombudsman audit certain child welfare 
system tools. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, the bill increases state and local 
expenditures. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $109,392 to the 
Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman. 
Fiscal Note  
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill, which is recommended by the Colorado 
Child Welfare System Interim Study Committee 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts HB 24-1046 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$109,392  $116,463  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$9,298  $7,439  
 
Total Expenditures 	$118,690  $123,902  
 	Total FTE 	0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$16,409  $17,469  
   Page 2 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1046 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
As described in more detail below, this bill requires that: 
 reports for child abuse include any evidence of domestic violence; 
 the child abuse hotline have a disclaimer that calls are recorded; and 
 the Child Protection Ombudsman audit certain child welfare system tools.   
Reporting child abuse. The bill requires reports of known or suspected child abuse or neglect 
to include any evidence of known domestic violence or intimate partner violence, including past 
cases, in a child’s home whenever possible. The Colorado Department of Human Services 
(CDHS) must also review the screening process used by counties and hotline system operators 
and create a consistent screening process, which includes questions about domestic or intimate 
partner violence, for county departments to follow while responding to a report from the child 
abuse reporting hotline. Finally, the CDHS must develop a disclosure that notifies callers that 
calls to the child abuse reporting hotline are recorded. 
Audit of child welfare system tools. The bill requires the Colorado Child Protection 
Ombudsman (OCPO) to contract with a third party to conduct audits on the Colorado family 
safety assessment and the Colorado family risk assessment. The OCPO must report the results of 
the audit by March 1, 2026.  
State Expenditures 
The bill will increase General Fund expenditures in the OCPO by about $119,000 in FY 2024-25 
and $124,000 in FY 2025-26 as shown in Table 2 and discussed below. In addition, workload in 
the CDHS will increase in FY 2024-25 only.  
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1046 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Child Protection Ombudsman   
Personal Services 	$37,798  $30,239  
Operating Expenses 	$640  $512  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670  	- 
Audit Contract 	$64,284  $85,712  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$9,298  $7,439  
Total Costs $118,690  $123,902  
Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   Page 3 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1046 
 
 
 
Child Protection Ombudsman. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, costs in the OCPO will 
increase to hire additional staff and to contract for the required audits, as described below. 
 
 Staff. From FY 2024-25 through FY 2025-26, the OCPO requires 0.5 FTE to develop request 
for proposals, review the proposals, choose a third party administer, and to manage the 
contract with the third party administrator. Costs assume an August 1, 2024 start date, and 
includes standard operating and capital outlay expenses.  
 
 Audit contract. Costs in the OCPO will increase to contract with a third-party administrator 
to conduct audits on the required tools outlined in the bill. The fiscal note estimates that 
contractor costs will be about $11,000 per month, with work starting on January 1, 2025 and 
finishing by March 1, 2026. This results in six months of costs in FY 2024-25 ($64,000) and 
eight months of cost in FY 2025-26 ($86,000). 
Department of Human Services. In FY 2024-25, workload to the CDHS will increase to update 
rules to reflect the requirements of the bill, update messaging/recordings for the child abuse 
hotline, and to provide information as needed to the auditor. This work can be accomplished 
within existing appropriations.  
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Local Government  
To the extent that county departments are involved with any of the audits, or if additional 
training is needed for screenings of domestic violence, workload to county departments of 
human services will increase. 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 28, 2024. 
   Page 4 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1046 
 
 
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $109,392 to the 
Office of the Child Protection Ombudsman, and 0.5 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Child Welfare       Counties     Human Services  
Information Technology    Law 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.