Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1059 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/06/2024

                    Page 1 
February 6, 2024  HB 24-1059 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0843  
Rep. English; Ricks 
Sen. Hansen  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 6, 2024 
House State Affairs  
Jessika Shipley | 303-866-3528 
jessika.shipley@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: COMPENSATION FOR STATE ELECTED OFFICIALS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill increases the amount of per diem paid to members of the Colorado General 
Assembly beginning in FY 2025-26.  It also creates an independent commission to set 
the compensation for state elected officials. The bill increases state expenditures on 
an ongoing basis beginning in FY 2025-26. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1059 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	-     $317,480 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	- $47,622 
   Page 2 
February 6, 2024  HB 24-1059 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill changes how compensation is determined for state elected officials, as described below. 
Legislative per diem. Beginning in FY 2025-26, this bill modifies the per diem rate that may be 
claimed by members of the Colorado General Assembly. For a member residing in the Denver 
Metro Area, the new rate will be 25 percent of the federal per diem rate set for the City and 
County of Denver by the United States General Services Administration (GSA) as of October 1 of 
the calendar year immediately preceding the fiscal year in which the per diem rate is to be used. 
For a member who does not reside in the Denver Metro Area, the new rate will be 90 percent of 
that federal per diem rate. 
Independent State Elected Official Pay Commission. The bill also creates the nine-member 
Independent State Elected Official Pay Commission, which meets every four years to set the 
compensation for members of the General Assembly, the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, 
the Attorney General, the Secretary of State, and the State Treasurer. The initial commission 
members must be appointed by the Governor and members of legislative leadership on or 
before July 31, 2025; the commission must have its first meeting on or before 
September 1, 2025 and meet as many times as necessary to compile a report; and the 
commission must submit the report on or before December 15, 2025, to the Office of State 
Planning and Budgeting, the Joint Budget Committee, the President of the Senate, and the 
Speaker of the House of Representatives regarding its recommendations. Each commission 
expires upon the delivery of the report. 
The commission will be staffed by the Department of Personnel and Administration (DPA). 
Members of the commission do not receive compensation for serving, but will be reimbursed for 
reasonable travel expenses incurred to attend meetings. 
The salaries and allowances recommended by the commission in the initial report take effect on 
January 1, 2027. Subsequent commissions will be appointed, meet, and report on the same 
schedule every four years. The General Assembly may modify or reject the commission’s 
recommendations. When making recommendations, the commission is required to consider the 
amount of compensation paid in government service and the private sector for similar positions; 
the amount of compensation needed to attract and retain experienced and competent persons; 
and the ability of the state to pay the recommended compensation. 
On January 1 of every year except those years that a commission’s recommendation take effect, 
the amount of compensation paid to state elected officials adjusts for inflation. 
Background 
Under current law, the per diem and compensation rates for members of the General Assembly, 
and compensation rates for other state elected officials are set in statute and require legislative 
action to change. Base salary rates are tied to those of state justices and judges. More 
information on legislative and elected official salaries may be found on the General Assembly 
website.   Page 3 
February 6, 2024  HB 24-1059 
 
 
 
Assumptions 
Per diem. The fiscal note assumes that the federal per diem rate will continue to grow at the 
same rate for the next several fiscal years and the number of metro (61) versus non-metro 
(39) legislators will remain the same. Per diem will be paid for 120 days of the legislative session 
and approximately 20 additional days of special session or interim legislative activities each fiscal 
year. 
Commission. The fiscal note assumes that contract staff hired by DPA will, among other tasks, 
assist with the following for the commission: 
 reaching out to the Governor and legislative leadership to get appointments made to the 
commission by July 31, 2025 (and every four years thereafter); 
 organizing the commissioners and the rules and procedures for commission meetings 
beginning September 1, 2025 (and every four years thereafter); 
 facilitating approximately five commission meetings per cycle and providing necessary 
background research for the commission’s discussions; and 
 writing the report detailing the commission’s recommendation regarding compensation by 
December 15, 2025 (and every four years thereafter). 
The fiscal note further assumes that commission members who reside in areas outside of the 
Denver Metro Area will participate in meetings electronically, rather than traveling to a central 
location. 
State Expenditures 
In FY 2025-26, this bill will increase General Fund expenditures in the Legislative Department by 
$298,480 and in DPA by $19,000. Costs in the Legislative Department will increase by similar 
amounts in future years, plus inflation. DPA costs are incurred every four years. 
Legislative Department. Legislative Council Staff (LCS) is required to adjust legislative per diem 
rates beginning in FY 2025-26 and each year thereafter. The bill also requires LCS to adjust the 
compensation rates for state elected officials to account for inflation beginning January 1, 2028, 
and before January 1 of each year thereafter. Such adjustments are commonly made in the 
course of regular accounting practices and do not represent an increase in workload. 
Under current law, the per diem rate for metro legislators is $45 and for non-metro legislators is 
$240. This bill increases those rates to $71 and $254, respectively, in FY 2025-26, increasing the 
total cost for all 100 members of the General Assembly by $298,480. 
   Page 4 
February 6, 2024  HB 24-1059 
 
 
 
Department of Personnel and Administration. Beginning in FY 2025-26, the bill requires DPA 
to staff the new commission every four years. Because the commission will only meet for a few 
months every four years, the fiscal note assumes that DPA will hire contract staff from 
September through December in 2025, and for each four-year cycle thereafter. Costs for the 
contractor, estimated at about $19,000, are based on a Human Resource Specialist IV working 
half-time during the four-month contract (equivalent to 0.2 FTE). Should the workload of staffing 
the commission prove to be higher than anticipated, the department will request additional 
funding through the annual budget process. 
Other Budget Impacts  
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Governor       Joint Budget Committee Staff     Law  
Legislative Council Staff   Personnel          Secretary of State 
Treasury  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.