Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1064 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/11/2024

                    Page 1 
March 8, 2024  HB 24-1064 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0284  
Rep. Wilson 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 8, 2024 
House Finance  
Nina Forbes | 303-866-4785 
nina.forbes@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: GADSDEN FLAG DON’T TREAD ON ME LICENSE PLATE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Gadsden flag "Don't Tread on Me" license plate. It increases state 
and local revenue and state expenditures on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $18,329 to the Department of 
Revenue. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1064 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	$98,635  $106,954  
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$18,329  $19,910  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	$98,635  $106,954  
   Page 2 
March 8, 2024  HB 24-1064 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Gadsden flag "Don't Tread on Me" license plate. The license plate will be 
available to all applicants that pay three one-time fees of $25, one of which will be credited to 
the State Charter School Debt Reserve Fund. It will be available January 1, 2025, or when the 
department is able to issue the plates. 
Background 
DRIVES programming. The Division of Motor Vehicles (DMV) in the DOR uses its Driver 
License, Record, Identification and Vehicle Enterprise Solution (DRIVES) information technology 
system for all driver license and motor vehicle transactions. The DRIVES system requires an 
extensive 18-month upgrade which is scheduled to take place from July 1, 2024, through 
March 31, 2026. As a result, the DOR has requested that any new legislation requiring DRIVES 
programming have an effective date of April 1, 2026, with roll-forward spending authority 
through FY 2026-27, noting that each programming requirement during the system upgrade 
period may increase the overall project timeline. Based on the current effective date in the bill, 
the fiscal note includes costs for the DRIVES programming to take place twice—in the existing 
and new system. 
Assumptions 
Demand for this new plate is assumed to be similar to the demand for the Pueblo Chile license 
plate. For the Pueblo Chile license plate, 1,160 plates were issued in the first year of availability 
and 1,248 were issued in the second year.  
State Revenue 
The bill is anticipated to increase cash fund revenue by $98,635 FY 2024-25 and $106,954 in  
FY 2025-26 and future years, as shown in Table 2. This revenue is subject to TABOR. 
Table 2 
State Revenue Under HB 24-1064 
 
 
FY 2024-25 
 
FY 2025-26 
License Plate Sets Issued 	1,160       1,248       
Highway Users Tax Fund ($25) 	$29,000 $31,200 
DRIVES Cash Fund ($25) 	$29,000 $31,200 
State Charter School Debt Reserve Fund ($25) 	$29,000 $31,200 
License Plate Cash Fund ($10.03 in FY 2024-25, $10.70 in FY 2025-26) $11,635 $13,354 
Total Revenue $98,635 $106,954 
 
   Page 3 
March 8, 2024  HB 24-1064 
 
 
Standard license plate fees. Upon registration, all vehicle owners must pay a plate and tab 
production fee of $10.03 for a digital passenger vehicle plate set in FY 2024-25 and $10.70 the 
following year. All specialty plates are manufactured as digital plates, and the fiscal note 
assumes motorcycle issuance will be minimal. Fees from plate and tab production are credited 
to the License Plate Cash Fund (LPCF).  
 
Special license plate fees. Applicants for the Gadsden flag special license plate are also 
required to pay an additional $75 in one-time fees, of which $25 is credited to the Highway 
Users Tax Fund (HUTF), $25 is credited to the DRIVES Cash Fund, and $25 is credited to the State 
Charter School Debt Reserve Fund. 
 
Colorado Department of Transportation.  Of the HUTF revenue generated under this bill, 
65 percent is credited to the State Highway Fund (SHF) for expenditure by the department, 
26 percent is credited to counties, and 9 percent is credited to municipalities. Table 3 outlines 
the estimated distribution of HUTF revenue generated under this bill. 
Table 3 
Estimated HUTF Distributions Under HB 24-1064 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
State Highway Fund (65 percent) 	$18,850 $20,280  
Counties (26 percent)  	$7,540 $8,112  
Municipalities (9 percent) 	$2,610 $2,808  
Total HUTF Distribution $29,000  $31,200  
State Expenditures 
Expenditures in DOR will increase by $18,329 in FY 2024-25, and by $19,910 in FY 2025-26 and 
future years, as shown in Table 4. Spending from the State Highway Fund by the Department of 
Transportation will also increase. 
Table 4 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1064 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Revenue   
Computer Programming 	$6,444       $6,556       
Plate and Tab Production 	$11,885       $13,354              
Total Cost $18,329 $19,910 
 
 
   Page 4 
March 8, 2024  HB 24-1064 
 
 
Department of Revenue. The DOR will have costs to make computer system changes, produce 
the new plates, and make other updates, as outlined below. 
 
 Computer programming. Computer programming costs in FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26 
include DRIVES programming, estimated at 16 hours at a rate of $248 per hour in 
FY 2024-25 and 16 hours at a rate of $255 per hour in FY 2025-26; ISD development and 
testing costs, estimated at 23 hours at a rate of $35 per hour in each year; support from the 
Office of Information Technology estimated at 13 hours at a rate of $99 per hour in each 
year, paid to OIT through real-time billing; and business user acceptance testing at 12 hours 
at a rate of $32 per hour in each year. 
 Plate and tab production. As discussed in the State Revenue section, plate tab and 
production costs are $10.03 per license plate set in FY 2024-25 and $10.70 per license plate 
set in FY 2025-26. Based on the assumed number of plates, this will increase costs as shown 
in Table 4 above.  These costs are paid from the LPCF.  
 Update training and materials. In addition, DOR will be required to update rules, forms, 
manuals, and the department's website to reflect the change in law. Additionally, the DOR 
will provide training to authorized agents, Title and Registration Section staff, and law 
enforcement. Any workload increases or costs associated with these activities can be 
accomplished within existing appropriations. 
Department of Transportation. By increasing revenue to the State Highway Fund, 
expenditures by the Department of Transportation on transportation projects will also increase.  
Future decisions on the amount and timing of such expenditures will be made by the 
Transportation Commission and are not estimated here. 
Other Budget Impacts 
TABOR refunds. The bill is expected to increase the amount of state revenue required to be 
refunded to taxpayers by the amounts shown in the State Revenue section above. This estimate 
assumes the December 2023 LCS revenue forecast. A forecast of state revenue subject to TABOR 
is not available beyond FY 2024-25. Because TABOR refunds are paid from the General Fund, 
increased cash fund revenue will reduce the amount of General Fund available to spend or save. 
Local Government 
This bill will increase local government HUTF revenue by the amounts shown in Table 3. HUTF 
revenue generated by license plate fees is distributed to counties (26 percent) and municipalities 
(9 percent) for transportation needs. 
Technical Note 
The fiscal note currently includes a duplicative programming cost for the DOR’s DRIVES system, 
as discussed in the Background section. The duplicate cost would be removed if the bill’s 
effective date were amended to April 1, 2026, when the DRIVES upgrade is complete.  Page 5 
March 8, 2024  HB 24-1064 
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires appropriations of $18,329 to the Department of Revenue, 
including: 
 $11,885 from the License Plate Cash Fund; and 
 $6,444 from the DRIVES Cash Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Revenue  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.