Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1103 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/05/2024

                    Page 1 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1103 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0414  
Rep. Amabile; Herod 
Sen. Gonzales; Buckner  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 5, 2024 
Signed into Law  
Aaron Carpenter | 303-866-4918 
aaron.carpenter@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROHIBITING TERM EXCITED DELIRIUM  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
No fiscal impact. The bill prohibits the use of “excited delirium” in first responder 
trainings, peace officer incident reports, and as the cause of death in death 
certificates. The bill codifies current practice and is assessed as having no fiscal impact.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill prohibits the use of the term “excited delirium” in first responder trainings, in peace 
officer incident reports, and as the cause of death in death certificates. The bill defines “excited 
delirium” as a term used to describe a person’s state of agitation, excitability, paranoia, extreme 
aggression, physical violence, and apparent immunity to pain that is not listed in the most 
recent version of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders. The term also 
includes excited delirium syndrome, hyperactive delirium, agitated delirium, and exhaustive 
mania.  
Background 
On December 1, 2023, the Peace Officer Standards and Training (POST) Board voted to no 
longer recognize the term “excited delirium” and to remove the term from all training 
documents. In addition, the Colorado Department on Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) 
reports that the term cannot be selected as a cause of death for the state’s Vital Records Office 
Electronic Death Registration System, and has not been used on certification by coroners or 
medical examiners since 2019.  
Assessment of No Fiscal Impact 
Based on the administrative actions issued by the POST Board and CDPHE outlined in the 
Background section, the bill is codifying current practice; therefore, the bill has been assessed as 
having no fiscal impact on state or local governments.   Page 2 
June 5, 2024  HB 24-1103 
 
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on April 4, 2024, and takes effect on 
August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties      County Coroners     Higher Education  
Law       Natural Resources     Public Health and Environment 
Public Safety     Revenue  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.