Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1135 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/03/2024

                    Page 1 
April 3, 2024  HB 24-1135 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 23, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0743  
Rep. Soper; Snyder 
Sen. Roberts; Will  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 3, 2024 
House Finance 
Colin Gaiser | 303-866-2677 
colin.gaiser@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: OFFENSES RELATED TO OPERATING A VEHICLE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill modifies the penalty for operating a commercial motor vehicle without a 
commercial driver license and requires the Transportation Legislation Review 
Committee to analyze the issue of enforcing impaired driving offenses. It increases 
state and local revenue and expenditures on an ongoing basis.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $1,455 from the DRIVES Cash 
Fund to the Department of Revenue.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Judiciary 
Committee. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1135 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 	Highway Users Tax Fund 	$12,400 	$12,400 
Expenditures 	DRIVES Cash Fund 	$1,455  	$1.483  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	$12,400  	$12,400  
   Page 2 
April 3, 2024  HB 24-1135 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill makes it a class 1 misdemeanor traffic offense to operate a commercial motor vehicle 
without a commercial driver license; to operate a commercial motor vehicle while under 21 years 
of age; or to drive a commercial vehicle with more than one license. The offense becomes a class 
A traffic infraction if an offender presents a valid commercial driver license to the court within 
30 days.  
In addition, during the 2024 legislative interim, the bill requires the Transportation Legislation 
Review Committee to analyze the issue of enforcement of impaired driving offenses, including 
situations involving a driver that refuses to take or complete a blood or breath test as required 
by law.   
Comparable Crime Analysis 
Legislative Council Staff is required to include certain information in the fiscal note for any bill 
that creates a new crime, changes the classification of an existing crime, or creates a new factual 
basis for an existing crime. The following section outlines crimes that are comparable to the 
offenses in this bill and discusses assumptions on future rates of criminal convictions resulting 
from the bill. 
Prior conviction data – unlawful commercial vehicle operation. This bill creates the offense 
of unlawful direction to operate a commercial motor vehicle. Commercial motor vehicle offenses 
are currently charged as class A traffic infraction. The new offense is a class 1 misdemeanor; 
however, it becomes a class A traffic infraction if the driver presents their commercial driver 
license within 30 days of the offense. From FY 2020-21 to FY 2022-23, 245 have been convicted 
and sentenced for this offense, or about 82 per year. Of the persons convicted, 240 were male, 
4 were female, and 1 did not have a gender identified. Demographically, 153 were White, 
23 were Black/African American, 14 were Hispanic, 2 were Asian, 45 were classified as "Other," 
and 8 did not have a race identified.  
Assumptions. Based on the comparable crime data above, the fiscal note assumes there will be 
about 82 cases per year for the violation of unlawful commercial vehicle operation. Assuming 
25 percent of offenders present a commercial driver license within the required timeframe, the 
fiscal note assumes 62 offenders will receive a sentence for the new class 1 misdemeanor 
offense per year. 
Visit leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes for more information about criminal justice costs in fiscal 
notes. 
State Revenue 
The bill will increase state revenue to the Highway Users Tax Fund (HUTF) by about $12,000 per 
year beginning in FY 2024-25, as shown in Table 2. This revenue is subject to TABOR.  
  Page 3 
April 3, 2024  HB 24-1135 
 
 
Table 2 
Revenue Under HB 24-1135 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Fines for CDL Offenses 	$12,400    $12,400     
Total $12,400 $12,400 
Commercial driver license offenses. The bill increases state revenue from increasing the fine 
for driving without a commercial license from $100 to at least $300. Using the assumptions 
outlined in the Comparable Crime Section, it is estimated that increasing the fine will increase 
revenue by at least $12,400 per year. Traffic fine revenue is deposited into the Highway Users 
Tax Fund (HUTF), with 65 percent going to the State Highway Fund, 26 percent going to 
counties, and 9 percent going to municipalities. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures from the DRIVES Cash Fund by about $1,500 in FY 2024-25 
and FY 2025-26 in the Department of Revenue (DOR). It also increases workload for the Judicial 
Department and the Legislative Department. Expenditures are shown in Table 3 and detailed 
below. 
Table 3 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1135 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Revenue   
Programming Costs 	$1,455  $1,483   
Total 	$1,455  $1,483  
 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Department of Revenue. The bill requires $1,455 in FY 2024-25 and $1,483 in FY 2025-26 for 
programing to the Driver License, Record, Identification and Vehicle Enterprise Solution (DRIVES) 
system to update the citation for operating a commercial vehicle without a license. Costs for 
programming will come from the DRIVES Cash Fund. 
 Duplicative DRIVES programming costs. The Division of Motor Vehicles (DMV) in the DOR 
uses the DRIVES information technology system for all driver license and motor vehicle 
transactions. The DRIVES system requires an extensive 18-month upgrade which is 
scheduled to take place from July 1, 2024, through March 31, 2026. Based on the current 
effective date in the bill, the fiscal note includes costs for the DRIVES programming to take 
place twice — in the existing and new system. 
 
Judicial Department. The bill minimally increases workload to the trial courts, independent 
agencies that represent indigent persons, and workload to the Division of Probation. This 
workload impact is absorbable within existing resources.  Page 4 
April 3, 2024  HB 24-1135 
 
 
Legislative Department. The Transportation Legislation Review Committee meets every 
interim, and will analyze the issue of enforcement of impaired driving offenses within existing 
resources. 
Other Budget Impacts 
TABOR refunds. The bill is expected to increase the amount of state revenue required to be 
refunded to taxpayers by the amounts shown in the State Revenue section above. This estimate 
assumes the March 2024 LCS revenue forecast. A forecast of state revenue subject to TABOR is 
not available beyond FY 2025-26. Because TABOR refunds are paid from the General Fund, 
increased cash fund revenue will reduce the amount of General Fund available to spend or save. 
Local Government 
HUTF revenue. By increasing traffic fines and offenses for driving a commercial vehicle without 
a license, the bill increases revenue from the HUTF to counties and municipalities.  
District attorneys. Expenditures to district attorney offices will increase to prosecute additional 
offenses. District attorney offices are funded by counties within each office’s judicial district.   
Jails. To the extent additional individuals are sentenced to jail for committing a misdemeanor, 
costs to jails will increase. The fiscal note assumes sentences to jails will be minimal.  
Denver County Court. Similar to the state, workload to Denver County Court will increase to try 
additional misdemeanor cases. Denver County Court is funded by the city and county of Denver.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature, and applies to offenses committed on or after the effective date.  
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $1,455 from the DRIVES Cash Fund to the 
Department of Revenue. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Corrections       Counties        District Attorneys  
Judicial         Law        Legislative Council Staff 
Public Safety       Revenue        Transportation 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.