Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1153 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/29/2024

                    Page 1 
April 26, 2024  HB 24-1153 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 12, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0286  
Rep. Garcia; Willford 
Sen. Cutter; Jaquez Lewis  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 26, 2024 
Senate Health & Human Services 
Brendan Fung | 303-866-4781 
brendan.fung@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PHYSICIAN CONTINUING EDUCATION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill establishes continuing medical education requirements for physician license 
renewal, reinstatement, or reactivation. It increases state expenditures starting in 
FY 2025-26 and state revenue starting in FY 2026-27. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1153 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Out Year 
FY 2026-27 
Revenue  	-     -     $32,470 
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-     $7,669       $13,171       
 
Centrally Appropriated 	-     $1,921       $3,632 
 
Total Expenditures 	-     $9,620 $16,803 
 	Total FTE 	-  0.1 FTE 0.2 FTE 
Transfers  	-  -  	- 
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	- 	- Not estimated 
   Page 2 
April 26, 2024  HB 24-1153 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires licensed physicians to complete continuing medical education (CME) before 
renewing, reinstating, or reactivating a license and authorizes the Colorado Medical Board to 
make rules, determine CME subject matter, audit licensees, and grant exemptions.  
Continuing medical education. For license renewal, reinstatement, or reactivation beginning in 
January 2026, a physician must complete 30 credit hours of approved CME in the 24 months 
preceding licensure. Eligible CME programs and activities are determined by specific 
accreditation associations, approved programs, and national certifications. Failure to complete 
CME requirements or comply with a Board audit constitutes unprofessional conduct and 
inactivates a physician’s license. 
Board duties. The Colorado Medical Board must initiative a stakeholder process to consider 
requirements and frequency of specific CME credit hours related to reproductive, sexual, and 
gender-based health care, health disparities, and biases. Additionally, the Board may make rules 
for CME implementation, waive CME requirements, extend the compliance period, approve CME 
topics, and audit up to five percent of randomly-selected license renewals for CME compliance.  
The bill requires the Division of Professions and Occupations in the Department of Regulatory 
Agencies (DORA) to increase license renewal fees to cover the cost of CME implementation. 
Assumptions 
It is assumed that the costs of CME implementation will be paid through a biennial fee levied on 
all licensed physicians in the state. Physician license renewal occurs in April of odd-numbered 
years; therefore, revenue increase from fees under the bill begin in April 2027 during 
FY 2026-27. Further, the fiscal note assumes that three percent of license renewals, or 
974 physicians, will be audited by the Board beginning in FY 2026-27 and every year thereafter. 
State Revenue 
The bill increases state cash fund revenue by about $32,500 in FY 2026-27, paid to the Division 
of Professions and Occupations Cash Fund, to cover the cost of implementing and administering 
CME requirements. On an ongoing basis, revenue will increase to DORA every two years 
assuming the fee is charged as part of the two-year renewal cycle for physician licenses. These 
impacts are shown in Table 2 and discussed in more detail below. 
Table 2 
Fee Impact on Licensed Physicians 
Fiscal Year Type of Fee Proposed Fee  Number Affected Total Fee Impact 
FY 2026-27 Physician License Fee 	$1 32,470 $32,470 
1
 The Physician License Fee is assumed to be charged biennially, beginning in FY 2026-27. Fee revenue is not 
anticipated in FY 2024-25 or FY 2025-26.  Page 3 
April 26, 2024  HB 24-1153 
 
 
 
Fee impact on licensed physicians. Colorado law requires legislative service agency review of 
measures which create or increase any fee collected by a state agency. Beginning in FY 2026-27 
and every two years thereafter, DORA will collect about $32,500 in additional fees to cover CME 
related costs. The fiscal note estimates a $1 increase for physician license renewal fees, which 
were $150 as of January 2024. This proposed fee increase is an estimate only; actual fees will be 
set administratively by DORA based on cash fund balance, estimated program costs, and the 
estimated number of licensees subject to the fee.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in DORA by about $9,600 in FY 2025-26 and $16,800 in 
FY 2026-27, paid from the Division of Professions and Occupations Cash Fund. Expenditures are 
shown in Table 3 and detailed below. 
Table 3 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1153 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 
Department of Regulatory Agencies    
Personal Services 	-       $7,669       $13,171       
Centrally Appropriated Costs 	-    $1,920       $3,632 
Total Cost 	- $9,620 $16,803 
Total FTE 	- 0.1 FTE 0.2 FTE 
Staff. In FY 2025-26 and FY 2026-27, DORA requires 0.1 FTE Marketing and Communications 
Specialist IV to communicate CME requirements to licensed physicians, handle stakeholder 
outreach and update marketing materials. Starting in FY 2026-27, DORA requires 0.2 FTE 
Technician III to conduct physician license renewal audits. Technician III staff costs and FTE are 
prorated in FY 2026-27 based on a start date of April 1, 2027. 
Legal services. In the first year, DORA will have an increase in costs for legal services associated 
with rulemaking and implementation of the new continuing education requirement. In future 
years, DORA will have an increase in legal services costs related to disciplinary actions for 
physicians who do not comply with the new requirement. Overall, it is estimated that any 
increase in legal services costs will be minimal (less than 100 hours per year) and adjusted 
through the budget process, if needed. Legal services are provided by the Department of Law. 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 3. 
  Page 4 
April 26, 2024  HB 24-1153 
 
 
 
Other Budget Impacts 
TABOR refunds. A forecast of state revenue subject to TABOR is not available beyond 
FY 2025-26. In future years where the state is above its revenue limit, increased revenue under 
the bill will increase TABOR refunds, paid from the General Fund. In these situation, increased 
cash fund revenue will reduce the amount of General Fund available to spend or save. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed, and applies to license renewals, reinstatements, or reactivations 
occurring on or after January 1, 2026. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
District Attorneys    Health Care Policy and Financing   Information Technology 
Judicial       Law          Regulatory Agencies  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.