Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1167 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/06/2024

                    Page 1 
June 6, 2024  HB 24-1167 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0200  
Rep. English; Bacon 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 6, 2024 
Postponed Indefinitely  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROHIBIT STUDENT SECLUSION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☒ School Districts 
 
The bill prohibits the use of seclusion as a disciplinary method in public schools and 
requires the State Board of Education and the Colorado Department of Education to 
create a resource bank of alternatives to student seclusion. The bill increases state 
expenditures in FY 2024-25 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $12,450 to the Colorado 
Department of Education. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. The bill was postponed indefinitely by the 
House Education Committee on April 25, 2024; therefore, the impacts identified in this 
analysis do not take effect. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1167 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$12,450     	-     
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$1,868 	- 
   Page 2 
June 6, 2024  HB 24-1167 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill prohibits the use of seclusion as a disciplinary measure in public schools. By 
November 1, 2024, the State Board of Education (SBE) must adopt, amend, or repeal rules to 
reflect the prohibition. By July 1, 2025, the board and the Colorado Department of Education 
(CDE) must create a publically accessible resource bank of materials regarding appropriate 
alternatives to seclusion and restraints. The bill requires that any incidents involving the use of 
seclusion are reported to the school administration and the student’s parent, and specifies that 
CDE has enforcement authority over investigation decisions related to seclusion. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDE by $12,450 in FY 2024-25 only, paid from the 
General Fund. The CDE currently has online resources regarding restraint and seclusion; 
however, the CDE will have costs for one year of contracted services and virtual stakeholder 
meetings to support the SBE to adopt rules, and to create and post the required resource bank.  
The bill also minimally increases workload for the department to administer these changes, 
contract with a vendor, and advise the State Board of Education on amendments or revisions to 
existing rules. In limited cases, the CDE may also have an increased workload to enforce 
seclusion investigation decisions. This additional workload does not require new appropriations. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
School Districts  
Public schools and districts will have increased workload to adjust internal policies and rules 
related to student discipline.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature. 
 State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $12,450 to the Colorado 
Department of Education.  Page 3 
June 6, 2024  HB 24-1167 
 
 
 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Early Childhood     Education      Judicial   
Law        School Districts  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.