Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1201 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/15/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0775.01 Craig Harper x3481
HOUSE BILL 24-1201
House Committees Senate Committees
Appropriations Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING A SUPPLEMENTAL APPR OPRIATION TO THE DEPARTMENT101
OF TRANSPORTATION .102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Supplemental appropriations are made to the department of
transportation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 15, 2024
SENATE
 2nd Reading Unamended
February 14, 2024
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 8, 2024
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 7, 2024
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Bird, Sirota, Taggart, Amabile, Bockenfeld, Froelich, Hamrick, Joseph, Lieder, Lindstedt,
Marshall, Mauro, McCluskie, McLachlan, Ricks, Snyder, Vigil, Woodrow
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Zenzinger, Bridges, Kirkmeyer, Cutter, Michaelson Jenet, Priola
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. SECTION 1. Appropriation to the department of1
transportation for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023. In Session2
Laws of Colorado 2023, section 2 of chapter 474, (SB 23-214), amend3
Part XXII as follows:4
Section 2. Appropriation.5
1201
-2- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
PART XXII	1
DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION	2
3
(1) ADMINISTRATION	4 44,157,292
44,094,354
a
62,938
b
5 49,725,508 49,662,570
a
6 (161.0 FTE)
7
a
 This amount shall be from the State Highway Fund created in Section 43-1-219, C.R.S., from revenues credited pursuant to Secti	on 43-4-205 (5)(a), C.R.S.	8
b
 This amount shall be funded internally by various cash fund sources appropriated in the Construction, Maintenance, and Operati ons section.	9
10
(2) CONSTRUCTION,	11
MAINTENANCE, AND	12
OPERATIONS	13 1,502,229,477
 667,864,641
(I)
a
1,415,158(I)
b
832,949,678(I)
14 1,496,661,261 662,296,425(I)
a
15 (3,156.0 FTE) 
1201
-3- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
1
a
 Of this amount, $601,671,641 shall be from the State Highway Fund created in Section 43-1-219, C.R.S., and $60,624,784 shall b	e from various department sources including: the	2
Aviation Fund created in Section 43-10-109 (1), C.R.S., miscellaneous department revenues including permit fees and interest ea	rnings, the State Transit and Rail Fund created in Section	3
43-4-811 (2), C.R.S., the Law Enforcement Assistance Fund created in Section 43-4-401, C.R.S., and interest earnings from the l	oans and balances of the Transportation Infrastructure	4
Revolving Fund created in Section 43-1-113.5 (1), C.R.S.	5
b
 This amount shall be funded from various sources of reappropriated funds. 	6
7
(3) STATEWIDE BRIDGE	8
AND TUNNEL	9
ENTERPRISE	10 152,974,026 152,974,026(I)
a
11(1.0 FTE)
12
a
 This amount shall be from the Statewide Bridge and Tunnel Enterprise Special Revenue Fund created in Section 43-4-	805 (3)(a), C.R.S. These funds are subject to allocation by the	13
Statewide Bridge Enterprise Board pursuant to Section 43-4-805 (3)(b), C.R.S., and are included for informational purposes only	. 	14
15
1201
-4- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
1
(4) HIGH	2
PERFORMANCE	3
TRANSPORTATION	4
ENTERPRISE	5 70,220,333 66,170,333(I)
a
4,050,000(I)
b
6(9.0 FTE)
7
a
 This amount shall be from the Statewide Transportation Enterprise Special Revenue Fund created in Section 43-4-806 (3)(a), C.R	.S. These funds are subject to allocation by the	8
High-Performance Transportation Enterprise Board pursuant to Section 43-4-806 (3), C.R.S., and are included for informational p	urposes only.	9
b
 This amount shall be from fees paid from the Construction, Maintenance, and Operations line item to the Statewide Transportati on Enterprise Operating Fund created in Section 43-4-806	10
(4), C.R.S.	11
12
(5) SPECIAL PURPOSE	13
First Time Drunk Driving	14
Offender Account	15 1,500,000 1,500,000
a
1201
-5- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
Marijuana Impaired Driving	1
Program 2 950,000 950,000
b
Multimodal Transportation	3
Projects
109
4 7,390,320 7,390,320
c
Appropriation to the	5
Colorado Wildlife Safe	6
Passages Fund	7 500,000 500,000
8 10,340,320
9	a
 This amount shall be from the First Time Drunk Driving Offender Account in the Highway Users Tax Fund created in Section 42-2-	132 (4)(b)(II)(A), C.R.S. 	10
b
 This amount shall be from the Marijuana Tax Cash Fund created in Section 39-28.8-501 (1), C.R.S.	11
c
 This amount shall be from the Multimodal Transportation and M itigation Options Fund created in Section 43-4-1103 (1)(a), C.R.S .	12
13
1201
-6- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
(6) NONATTAINMENT	1
AREA AIR POLLUTION	2
MITIGATION	3
ENTERPRISE	4 8,481,351 8,481,351(I)
a
5
a
 This amount shall be from the Nonattainment Area Air Pollutio n Mitigation Enterprise Fund cr eated in Section 43-4-1303 (5)(a), C.R.S. These funds are subject to allocation by the	6
Nonattainment Area Air Pollution Mitigation Enterprise Board purs uant to Section 43-4-1303, C.R.S., and are included for inform ational purposes only.	7
8
(7) CLEAN TRANSIT	9
ENTERPRISE	10 9,132,872 9,132,872
a
11
a
 This amount shall be from the Clean Transit Enterprise Fund created in Section 43-4-1203 (5)(a), C.R.S.	12
13
14
15
1201
-7- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
TOTALS PART XXII	1
(TRANSPORTATION)	2 $1,797,535,671 $500,000 $958,557,897
a
$5,528,096
b
$832,949,678
c
3
a
 Of this amount, $895,490,351
 $889,922,135 contains an (I) notation.	4
b
 Of this amount, $5,465,158 contains an (I) notation.	5
c
 This amount contains an (I) notation.	6
7
8
FOOTNOTES -- The following statements are referenced to the numbered footnotes throughout section 2.	9
10
109 Department of Transportation, Special Purpose, Multimodal Tr ansportation Projects -- This appropriation remains available un til the close of the 2026-27	11
state fiscal year.	12
1201
-8- SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,1
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate2
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for3
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state4
institutions.5
1201-9-