Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1217 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/17/2024

                    Page 1 
July 17, 2024  HB 24-1217 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0029  
Rep. Amabile; Ricks 
Sen. Mullica 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 17, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Kristine McLaughlin | 303-866-4776 
kristine.mclaughlin@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SHARING OF PATIENT HEALTH -CARE INFORMATION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the Behavioral Health Administration to create a friends and family 
input form and to convene a workgroup to study a centralized consent repository. The 
bill increases state expenditures on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill includes an appropriation of $50,604 to the Behavioral Health 
Administration in the Department of Human Services.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1217 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$50,604  $23,702  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$3,706  $1,853  
 
Total Expenditures 	$54,310  $25,555  
 	Total FTE 	0.3 FTE 0.2 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$7,591  $3,555  
   Page 2 
July 17, 2024  HB 24-1217 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires the Behavioral Health Administration (BHA) to create a friends and family input 
form to allow a patient’s family and friends to supply relevant information. The bill requires the 
BHA to solicit feedback from stakeholder and legal experts and make the form available by 
July 1, 2025.  
The bill also convenes a workgroup in the Governor’s Office to study a centralized consent 
repository and produce a report by January 1, 2026. Members must include various stakeholders 
and department representatives. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the BHA by $54,000 in FY 2024-25 and $26,000 annually 
thereafter, paid from the General Fund. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
Additionally, the bill increases workload for the Governor’s Office and other agencies. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1217 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Behavioral Health Administration   
Personal Services 	$15,399  $7,699  
Legal Services 	$32,005  $16,003  
Translation Services 	$3,200 	- 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$3,706  $1,853  
FTE – Personal Services 	0.2 FTE 0.1 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.1 FTE 0.1 FTE 
Total Cost $54,310  $25,555  
Total FTE 0.3 FTE 0.2 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Behavioral Health Administration. The BHA requires staff, legal services, and translation 
services to create and operate a friends and family input form. Based on the BHA’s experience 
with other inter-organization forms, this work is expected to be ongoing to update forms as 
needed and facilitate their use. These costs are detailed below. 
 Staff.  The BHA requires 0.2 FTE in the first year and 0.1 FTE ongoing to conduct the 
stakeholder engagement process, create and update the forms, and provide guidance to 
providers on how to collect and use forms. Staff support for this process is necessary given 
that it is a new area of concern involving a large number of stakeholders.  
   Page 3 
July 17, 2024  HB 24-1217 
 
 
 
 Legal services. The BHA requires 250 hours of legal services in FY 2024-25 and half those 
hours in future years to ensure that the family input process aligns with federal regulation 
concerning health information and help answer organization questions about the form. 
Legal services are provided by the Department of Law at a rate of $128.02 per hour. 
 Translation services. The BHA will translate the forms into four languages. This work is 
done through a contract for $0.16 per word. It is assumed that each form will be 
5,000 words. Costs to update the translations will be negotiated and the BHA will request 
additional funds as needed through the annual budget process. 
Governor’s Office. Workload will increase in the Governor’s Office to study a centralized 
consent repository and produce a report by January 1, 2026. Since the bill does not allow for 
member compensation and assuming that there will be fewer than 10 members, this work can 
be accomplished within existing resources.  
Other agencies. Workload will increase in other agencies including the Department of 
Corrections, the Department of Health Care Policy and Financing, and the Department of Public 
Health and Environment to participate in the stakeholder engagement process and adapt 
procedures to accept the forms. This work can be accomplished within existing resources.  
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 28, 2024. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $50,604 to the 
Behavioral Health Administration and 0.2 FTE. Of this amount, $32,005 is reappropriated to 
Department of Law with an additional 0.1 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Behavioral Health Administration   Corrections   District Attorneys  
Health Care Policy and Financing   Governor     Human Services  
Judicial          Law      Public Health and Environment 
Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.