Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1328 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/11/2024

                    Page 1 
April 11, 2024  HB 24-1328 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated March 4, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0573  
Rep. English; Clifford 
Sen. Rich  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 11, 2024 
Senate Finance 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SUNSET CONTINUE MONEY TRANSMITTER REGULATION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset bill. This bill continues the regulation of money transmitters in the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies, which is scheduled to repeal on 
September 1, 2024. State fiscal impacts include both the continuation of the 
program's current revenue and expenditures, and minimal impacts to revenue and 
expenditures as a result of the change in the bill. The program is continued through 
September 1, 2030. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1328
1
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 
 
-    	-    
Expenditures 
 
-    	-    
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-    $637,320    
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-    $927,938    
 	Continuing FTE 	-    10.0 FTE    
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	-    $637,320 
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing 
impacts from extending the program beyond its current repeal date. The continuing program impacts will end 
if the bill is not passed and the program is allowed to repeal.  Page 2 
April 11, 2024  HB 24-1328 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, the regulation of money transmitters by the Department of Regulatory 
Agencies (DORA) repeals on September 1, 2024. The bill continues the program until 
September 1, 2030 and makes the following changes: 
 allows the banking board to suspend a license and issue cease-and-desist orders;  
 expands the requirement to provide surety bond coverage to include all money 
transmission, rather than just exchange;  
 increases the penalty for failure to allow a records examination from $100 per day to $1,000 
per day;  
 increases the penalty for failure to report to DORA from $250 per day to $750 per day;  
 allows the State Banking Commissioner to forward fingerprints directly to the Federal Bureau 
of Investigation for a criminal history record check; and 
 repeals the requirement that licenses report contact information for each agent who owns at 
least 10 percent interest in the building. 
 
Under current law, licensing requirements do not apply to federal, state, or local agencies, or 
banking, savings, loan, credit unions that are organized under laws of Colorado or the United 
States. The bill expands this exemption to include those chartered in other states and repeals an 
exemption for telegraph or cable companies.  
Background 
Money transmitters are nonbank financial companies that transfers funds electronically and are 
used by customers to pay bills, buy products online, or sent money to other companies. Money 
transmitters are regulated by the State Banking Board in DORA. In 2022, there were 135 money 
transmitters.  
The sunset report published by DORA is available here.  
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on recent data, DORA is expected to have revenue of $637,320 and expenditures of 
$927,938 and 10.0 FTE to administer the regulatory program. If this bill is enacted, current 
revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2025-26. This continuing 
revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits. If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on 
September 1, 2025, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures will 
decrease starting in FY 2025-26 by the amounts shown in Table 1. The changes to the program 
that drive additional revenue and costs are discussed in the State Revenue and State 
Expenditures sections below. 
   Page 3 
April 11, 2024  HB 24-1328 
 
 
 
State Revenue 
The bill minimally increases fine revenue to the Division of Banking Cash Fund in DORA. The bill 
increases penalties for failure to report from $250 per day to $750 per day and failure to allow a 
records examination from $100 to $1,000 per day. However, no fines were assessed over the 
five years that the sunset report reviewed. As a result, the fiscal note assumes that the number 
of fines assessed and the associated revenue increase will be minimal.  
To the extent that the bill decreases licensure renewals due to expansion of licensing 
exemptions, application fee revenue will decrease. The current renewal fee is $3,000. Any change 
in fee revenue is expected to be minimal. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload for the Division of Banking in DORA to adjust their procedures and 
rules to align with the bill. To the extent the bill decreases licensure renewals due to expansion 
of licensing exemptions, workload will decrease. No change in appropriations is required.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law     Regulatory Agencies  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.