Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1329 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/28/2024

                    Page 1 
June 28, 2024  HB 24-1329 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0557  
Rep. Bird; Lindstedt 
Sen. Marchman  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 28, 2024 
Signed into Law  
Clayton Mayfield | 303-866-5851 
clayton.mayfield@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SUNSET ARCHITECTS ENGINEERS & LAND SURVEYORS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset bill. This bill continues the State Board of Licensure for Architects, Professional 
Engineers, and Professional Land Surveyors in the Department of Regulatory Agencies, 
which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2024. State fiscal impacts include only 
the continuation of the program’s current revenue and expenditures. The program is 
continued through September 1, 2033. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1329
1
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 
 
-    	-    
Expenditures 
 
-    	-    
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-    $1,488,099    
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-    $1,343,696    
 	Continuing FTE 	-    3.2 FTE    
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	-    $1,488,099    
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date. Changes under the bill will not have a fiscal impact in 
the program. The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is not passed and the program is allowed to 
repeal.  Page 2 
June 28, 2024  HB 24-1329 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill continues the State Board of Licensure for Architects, Professional Engineers, and 
Professional Land Surveyors in the Department of Regulatory Agencies (DORA), which is 
scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2024, for nine years, until September 1, 2033. The bill also 
makes changes to the program, including: 
 adding failure to respond to the board regarding complaints as a grounds for discipline; 
 updating references to names of professional examinations; 
 allowing noncitizens and nonresidents to be board members; and 
 repealing references regarding the Occupational Credential Portability Program. 
The full sunset report can be found here. 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on recent appropriations, DORA is expected to have revenue of about $1.5 million and 
expenditures of about $1.3 million to administer the program. If this bill is enacted, current 
revenue and expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2025-26. This continuing 
revenue is subject to the state TABOR limits. If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on 
September 1, 2024, following a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures will 
decrease starting in FY 2025-26 by the amounts shown in Table 1. The changes to the program 
do not drive additional revenue and costs.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 3, 2024, and takes effect on 
August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Regulatory Agencies  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.