Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1366 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/25/2024

                    Page 1 
March 22, 2024   HB 24-1366 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0978  
Rep. Froelich; Brown 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 22, 2024  
House Trans., Hous. & Local Govt. 
Colin Gaiser | 303-866-2677 
colin.gaiser@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SUSTAINABLE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMUNITY PLANNING  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates new prioritization criteria for state agencies awarding grants and 
establishes new requirements for climate action plans and transportation demand 
management plans. It increases state and local expenditures on an ongoing basis.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. The State Highway Fund is continuously appropriated to 
the Colorado Department of Transportation at the discretion of the Transportation 
Commission.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1366 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	- 	- 
 	State Highway Fund 	$300,000 $300,000 
 
Total Expenditures 	$300,000  $300,000  
 	Total FTE 	- 	- 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts  	-  	-  
   Page 2 
March 22, 2024   HB 24-1366 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Prioritization criteria for state programs. The bill requires state agencies to prioritize 
awarding grants that: 
 incentivize development that aligns with state climate and air quality goals; 
 encourage water conservation and efficiency, and reduce water supply, treatment, and 
infrastructure costs;  
 incentivize affordable housing development and promote access to transit that aligns with 
housing goals; and, 
 support economic development and revitalization efforts in downtown areas.  
Climate action plans. The bill requires counties and municipalities to include a climate action 
element in any master plan on or after January 1, 2025. A climate action element must include 
goals and strategies such as reducing greenhouse gas emissions, supporting electric vehicle 
charging infrastructure, reducing per capita vehicle miles traveled, and supporting renewable 
energy development. Once updated, a local government must provide the master plan to the 
Colorado Energy Office (CEO). The CEO must deliver the plan to the Department of Local Affairs 
(DOLA), the Colorado Department of Transportation (CDOT), and other agencies as determined 
by the CEO. 
Transportation management plans. By December 31, 2024, CDOT must coordinate with 
metropolitan planning organizations (MPO) to establish criteria that defines growth corridors, 
and by April 1, 2025, identify growth corridors that meet the criteria. By December 31, 2026, the 
department and MPO must coordinate with local governments to develop transportation 
demand management plans for these corridors.  
Statewide transportation plan. The bill requires the comprehensive statewide transportation 
plan to include new content related to transportation decisions on land use patterns; the 
promotion of walkable, mixed-use neighborhoods in transit-oriented centers along state 
highways; and the integration of planning efforts within CDOT to support multimodal 
transportation, neighborhood centers, and transit-oriented centers in infill areas and growth 
corridors.  
In conjunction with the state transportation plan, CDOT must conduct a study on policy barriers 
and opportunities for implementation of context-sensitive design and pedestrian safety 
measures in some urban centers, neighborhood centers, and portions of state highway.  
Background 
CDOT is primarily funded from the State Highway Fund (SHF), which is comprised of federal 
funds, the state’s share of the Highway Users Tax Fund, and other various sources of 
revenue.  The decision-making authority for the majority of state transportation revenue rests 
with the Transportation Commission, which is responsible for allocating funds from the SHF. 
   Page 3 
March 22, 2024   HB 24-1366 
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases State Highway Fund expenditures in CDOT by about $300,000 in FY 2024-25 
and FY 2025-26, and increases workload in the CEO and in various agencies that operate grant 
programs. 
Department of Transportation. The bill increases workload and expenditures in CDOT to 
develop and update transportation plans.   
 Transportation demand management plans. CDOT requires $300,000 in FY 2024-25 and 
FY 2025-26 to implement transportation demand management plans within state growth 
corridors. CDOT has identified six locations which likely fit the criteria of a growth corridor, 
two of which already possess a plan that could meet the bill’s requirements, so CDOT will 
collaborate with local governments and metropolitan planning organizations on four 
management plans over the course of two fiscal years. Based on the cost of previous 
management plans, each plan requires $150,000 for consulting support. Consulting costs will 
be paid from the State Highway Fund, which is allocated by the Transportation 
Commission. The commission will adjust spending from the SHF to accommodate the 
increase in CDOT expenditures under this bill.  
 Statewide transportation plan. Though the bill may increase workload in CDOT to update 
the statewide transportation plan to comply with the bill’s requirements, this work can be 
accomplished within existing resources. In addition, CDOT will absorb the required policy 
barriers study into previously planned work related to the transportation plan.   
Colorado Energy Office. The bill increases workload in the CEO starting in September 2024 to 
implement the bill’s requirements and coordinate with DOLA and CDOT on climate action plans. 
This workload is absorbable within existing resources.  
Other agencies. Various state agencies that operate grant programs will be required to adjust 
criteria for making grant awards to account for the new criteria outlined in the bill. It is assumed 
that these criteria will be used in addition to any existing criteria used by grant programs. 
Overall, this workload is expected to be minimal and can be accomplished within existing 
appropriations. 
Local Government  
The bill may increase workload for local governments that need to increase the scope of their 
master plans to include the required climate action elements. Workload may also increase for 
any local government that collaborates with CDOT in developing a transportation development 
management plan.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed.  Page 4 
March 22, 2024   HB 24-1366 
 
 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Colorado Energy Office     Counties      Local Affairs  
Public Health and Environment    Public Safety     Transportation  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.