Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1368 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/10/2024

                    Page 1 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1368 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1002  
Rep. Lindsay; Velasco 
Sen. Gonzales 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 10, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
erin.reynolds@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: LANGUAGE ACCESS ADVISORY BOARD  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Language Access Advisory Board in the Legislative Department to 
study and make recommendations on improving language access to the legislative 
process for populations with limited English proficiency over the 2024 interim. The bill 
increases state expenditures and local workload in FY 2024-25 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $29,741 to the 
Legislative Department. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1368 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$29,741  	-     
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$4,767  	-     
 
Total Expenditures 	$34,508  	-     
 	Total FTE 	0.3 FTE 	-  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$4,461 	- 
   Page 2 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1368 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Language Access Advisory Board in the Legislative Department to study and 
make recommendations on improving language access to the legislative process for populations 
with limited English proficiency over the 2024 interim. The Legislative Council Staff and Office of 
Legislative Legal Services will assist the board. The board must receive input from county clerks 
and the Secretary of State’s office. All board members are entitled to travel expense 
reimbursements, and legislative members also receive per diem payments.  
The board must convene its first meeting by July 31, 2024, meet at least four times over the 
2024 interim, and report to the Executive Committee of Legislative Council by 
December 15, 2024, on its work and its recommendations.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Legislative Department by about $35,000 in 
FY 2024-25 only, paid from the General Fund. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed 
below. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1368 
 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Legislative Department   
Personal Services 	$22,047    	-    
Per Diem and Expense Reimbursements 	$7,694    	-    
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$4,767    	-    
Total Cost 	$34,508 	- 
Total FTE 	0.3 FTE 	- 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Legislative Department. The bill increases expenditures in the Legislative Department to 
support the board. 
 Staff. Legislative Council Staff requires 0.3 FTE to staff the board and produce a final report. 
The Office of Legislative Legal Services can staff the board within existing resources as the 
board has no bill drafting authority.  
 Expense reimbursements and legislator per diems. The board is anticipated to meet four 
times in 2024. Costs are based on a per diem of $112 for five legislators and travel 
reimbursements for the 11 voting members at an estimated $124 per meeting at the Capitol.  Page 3 
June 10, 2024  HB 24-1368 
 
 
 
Other state agencies. The bill minimally increases workload in the Department of State to 
provide input to the board.  
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Local Government  
The bill minimally increases workload for county clerks to provide input to the board, and for a 
local government representative to serve on the board. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 28, 2024. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation to the Legislative 
Department as follows: 
 $22,047 to the Legislative Council Staff, and 0.3 FTE; and 
 $7,694 to the General Assembly. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties        County Clerks     Legislative Council Staff  
Legislative Legal Services    Municipalities     Secretary of State 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.