Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1421 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/01/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 24-1111.01 Pierce Lively x2059
HOUSE BILL 24-1421
House Committees Senate Committees
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING MODIFYING FUNDING FOR G	RANT PROGRAMS101
ADMINISTERED BY THE DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE IN THE102
DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY , AND, IN CONNECTION103
THEREWITH, MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .104
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Joint Budget Committee. The bill makes 3 changes to the
funding and administration of the multidisciplinary crime prevention and
crisis intervention grant program. The bill:
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 1, 2024
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 28, 2024
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Bird and Taggart, Sirota, Bradley, Clifford, Duran, McCluskie
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Bridges and Zenzinger, Kirkmeyer
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Requires the state treasurer to transfer $3 million from the
general fund to the multidisciplinary crime prevention and
crisis intervention grant fund on July 1, 2024;
! Modifies the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis
intervention grant fund so that money in the fund is
annually, rather than continuously, appropriated; and
! Extends the repeal date of the multidisciplinary crime
prevention and crisis intervention grant program, grant
fund, and advisory committee from January 1, 2025, to July
1, 2027.
The bill also modifies both the law enforcement workforce
recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund and the SMART policing
grant fund so that money in both funds is annually, rather than
continuously, appropriated.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-31-903, amend2
(5) as follows:3
24-31-903. Division of criminal justice report. (5) The4
Colorado state patrol and any local law enforcement agency that fails to5
meet its reporting requirements pursuant to this section is:6
(a) Subject to the suspension of its funding by its appropriating7
authority; AND 8
(b) UNLESS THE COLORADO STATE PATROL OR LOCAL LAW9
ENFORCEMENT AGENCY IS WORKING WITH THE DIVISION OF CRIMINAL10
JUSTICE TO MEET ITS REPORTING REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO THIS11
SECTION, NOT ELIGIBLE TO BE AWARDED GRANTS UNDER THE12
MULTIDISCIPLINARY CRIME PREVENTION GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION13
24-33.5-527, THE LAW ENFORCEMENT WORKFORCE RECRUITMENT,14
RETENTION, AND TUITION GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION 24-33.5-528, OR15
THE STATE'S MISSION FOR ASSISTANCE IN RECRUITING AND TRAINING16
(SMART) POLICING GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION 24-33.5-529.17
1421-2- SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-527, amend1
(4)(a) and (6); and add (4)(c.5) as follows:2
24-33.5-527.  Multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis3
intervention grant program - committee - fund - reports - repeal.4
(4) (a)  There is created in the state treasury the multidisciplinary crime5
prevention and crisis intervention grant fund, referred to in this section as6
the "fund", consisting of any money appropriated to the fund by the7
general assembly and any money received by the division from gifts,8
grants, or donations for the grant program. The money in the fund is9
continuously appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL10
APPROPRIATION BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY , THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND11
MONEY FROM THE FUND for the direct and indirect costs associated with12
implementing the grant program.13
(c.5) (I)  O
N JULY 1, 2024, THE STATE TREASURER SHALL TRANSFER14
THREE MILLION DOLLARS FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE FUND .15
(II)  T
HIS SUBSECTION (4)(c.5) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1,16
2025.17
(6)  This section is repealed, effective January 1, 2025
 JULY 1,18
2027.19
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-528, amend20
(4)(a) as follows:21
24-33.5-528.  Law enforcement workforce recruitment,22
retention, and tuition grant program - committee - fund - reports -23
repeal. (4) (a)  There is created in the state treasury the law enforcement24
workforce recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund, referred to in this25
section as the "fund", consisting of any money appropriated to the fund26
by the general assembly and any money received by the division from27
1421
-3- gifts, grants, or donations for the grant program. The money in the fund1
is continuously appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL2
APPROPRIATION BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY , THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND3
MONEY FROM THE FUND for the direct and indirect costs associated with4
implementing the grant program.5
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-529, amend6
(4)(a) as follows:7
24-33.5-529.  State's mission for assistance in recruiting and8
training (SMART) grant program - committee - fund - reports -9
definitions - repeal. (4) (a)  There is created in the state treasury the10
SMART policing grant fund, referred to in this section as the "fund",11
consisting of any money appropriated to the fund by the general assembly12
and any money received by the division from gifts, grants, or donations13
for the SMART policing program. The money in the fund is continuously14
appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL APPROPRIATION BY THE15
GENERAL ASSEMBLY, THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND MONEY FROM THE FUND16
for the direct and indirect costs associated with implementing the17
SMART policing program.18
SECTION 5. Appropriation. (1)   For the 2024-25 state fiscal19
year, $14,493,178 is appropriated to the department of public safety for20
use by the division of criminal justice. This appropriation consists of21
$7,031,919 from the SMART policing grant fund created in section22
24-33.5-529 (4)(a), C.R.S., $3,868,229 from the multidisciplinary crime23
prevention and crisis intervention grant fund created in section24
24-33.5-527 (4)(a), C.R.S., and $3,593,030 from the law enforcement25
workforce recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund created in section26
24-33.5-528 (4)(a), C.R.S. To implement this act, the division may use27
1421
-4- this appropriation as follows:1
(a)  $7,031,919 from the SMART policing grant fund for the direct2
and indirect costs associated with implementing the SMART policing3
grant program;4
(b)  $3,868,229 from the multidisciplinary crime prevention and5
crisis intervention grant fund for the direct and indirect costs associated6
with implementing the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis7
intervention grant program; and8
(c)  $3,593,030 from the law enforcement workforce recruitment,9
retention, and tuition grant fund for the direct and indirect costs10
associated with implementing the law enforcement workforce11
recruitment, retention, and tuition grant program.12
SECTION 6. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,13
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate14
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for15
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state16
institutions.17
1421
-5-