Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the Second House LLS NO. 24-1111.01 Pierce Lively x2059 HOUSE BILL 24-1421 House Committees Senate Committees Appropriations Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING MODIFYING FUNDING FOR G RANT PROGRAMS101 ADMINISTERED BY THE DIVISION OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE IN THE102 DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY , AND, IN CONNECTION103 THEREWITH, MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .104 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov/ .) Joint Budget Committee. The bill makes 3 changes to the funding and administration of the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis intervention grant program. The bill: SENATE 2nd Reading Unamended April 4, 2024 HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended April 1, 2024 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading March 28, 2024 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Bird and Taggart, Sirota, Bradley, Clifford, Duran, McCluskie SENATE SPONSORSHIP Bridges and Zenzinger, Kirkmeyer Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Requires the state treasurer to transfer $3 million from the general fund to the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis intervention grant fund on July 1, 2024; ! Modifies the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis intervention grant fund so that money in the fund is annually, rather than continuously, appropriated; and ! Extends the repeal date of the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis intervention grant program, grant fund, and advisory committee from January 1, 2025, to July 1, 2027. The bill also modifies both the law enforcement workforce recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund and the SMART policing grant fund so that money in both funds is annually, rather than continuously, appropriated. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-31-903, amend2 (5) as follows:3 24-31-903. Division of criminal justice report. (5) The4 Colorado state patrol and any local law enforcement agency that fails to5 meet its reporting requirements pursuant to this section is:6 (a) Subject to the suspension of its funding by its appropriating7 authority; AND 8 (b) UNLESS THE COLORADO STATE PATROL OR LOCAL LAW9 ENFORCEMENT AGENCY IS WORKING WITH THE DIVISION OF CRIMINAL10 JUSTICE TO MEET ITS REPORTING REQUIREMENTS PURSUANT TO THIS11 SECTION, NOT ELIGIBLE TO BE AWARDED GRANTS UNDER THE12 MULTIDISCIPLINARY CRIME PREVENTION GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION13 24-33.5-527, THE LAW ENFORCEMENT WORKFORCE RECRUITMENT,14 RETENTION, AND TUITION GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION 24-33.5-528, OR15 THE STATE'S MISSION FOR ASSISTANCE IN RECRUITING AND TRAINING16 (SMART) POLICING GRANT PROGRAM IN SECTION 24-33.5-529.17 1421-2- SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-527, amend1 (4)(a) and (6); and add (4)(c.5) as follows:2 24-33.5-527. Multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis3 intervention grant program - committee - fund - reports - repeal.4 (4) (a) There is created in the state treasury the multidisciplinary crime5 prevention and crisis intervention grant fund, referred to in this section as6 the "fund", consisting of any money appropriated to the fund by the7 general assembly and any money received by the division from gifts,8 grants, or donations for the grant program. The money in the fund is9 continuously appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL10 APPROPRIATION BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY , THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND11 MONEY FROM THE FUND for the direct and indirect costs associated with12 implementing the grant program.13 (c.5) (I) O N JULY 1, 2024, THE STATE TREASURER SHALL TRANSFER14 THREE MILLION DOLLARS FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE FUND .15 (II) T HIS SUBSECTION (4)(c.5) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1,16 2025.17 (6) This section is repealed, effective January 1, 2025 JULY 1,18 2027.19 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-528, amend20 (4)(a) as follows:21 24-33.5-528. Law enforcement workforce recruitment,22 retention, and tuition grant program - committee - fund - reports -23 repeal. (4) (a) There is created in the state treasury the law enforcement24 workforce recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund, referred to in this25 section as the "fund", consisting of any money appropriated to the fund26 by the general assembly and any money received by the division from27 1421 -3- gifts, grants, or donations for the grant program. The money in the fund1 is continuously appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL2 APPROPRIATION BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY , THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND3 MONEY FROM THE FUND for the direct and indirect costs associated with4 implementing the grant program.5 SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-529, amend6 (4)(a) as follows:7 24-33.5-529. State's mission for assistance in recruiting and8 training (SMART) grant program - committee - fund - reports -9 definitions - repeal. (4) (a) There is created in the state treasury the10 SMART policing grant fund, referred to in this section as the "fund",11 consisting of any money appropriated to the fund by the general assembly12 and any money received by the division from gifts, grants, or donations13 for the SMART policing program. The money in the fund is continuously14 appropriated to the division SUBJECT TO ANNUAL APPROPRIATION BY THE15 GENERAL ASSEMBLY, THE DIVISION MAY EXPEND MONEY FROM THE FUND16 for the direct and indirect costs associated with implementing the17 SMART policing program.18 SECTION 5. Appropriation. (1) For the 2024-25 state fiscal19 year, $14,493,178 is appropriated to the department of public safety for20 use by the division of criminal justice. This appropriation consists of21 $7,031,919 from the SMART policing grant fund created in section22 24-33.5-529 (4)(a), C.R.S., $3,868,229 from the multidisciplinary crime23 prevention and crisis intervention grant fund created in section24 24-33.5-527 (4)(a), C.R.S., and $3,593,030 from the law enforcement25 workforce recruitment, retention, and tuition grant fund created in section26 24-33.5-528 (4)(a), C.R.S. To implement this act, the division may use27 1421 -4- this appropriation as follows:1 (a) $7,031,919 from the SMART policing grant fund for the direct2 and indirect costs associated with implementing the SMART policing3 grant program;4 (b) $3,868,229 from the multidisciplinary crime prevention and5 crisis intervention grant fund for the direct and indirect costs associated6 with implementing the multidisciplinary crime prevention and crisis7 intervention grant program; and8 (c) $3,593,030 from the law enforcement workforce recruitment,9 retention, and tuition grant fund for the direct and indirect costs10 associated with implementing the law enforcement workforce11 recruitment, retention, and tuition grant program.12 SECTION 6. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,13 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate14 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for15 the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state16 institutions.17 1421 -5-