Page 1 May 15, 2024 HB 24-1421 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 24-1111 Rep. Bird; Taggart Sen. Zenzinger; Kirkmeyer Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: May 15, 2024 Signed into Law Clayton Mayfield | 303-866-5851 clayton.mayfield@coleg.gov Bill Topic: MODIFYING PUBLIC SAFETY PROGRAM FUNDING Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☐ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☒ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity Budget package bill. The bill transfers $3.0 million from the General Fund to the Multidisciplinary Crime Prevention and Crisis Intervention Grant Fund in the Department of Public Safety and continues the program through FY 2026-27; modifies the appropriation authority of this and other CDPS funds; and makes appropriations. The bill increases state expenditures in FY 2024-25. Appropriation Summary: For FY 2024-25, the bill includes appropriations totaling $14.5 million to the Department of Public Safety; see State Appropriations section. Fiscal Note Status: The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. The bill was recommended by the Joint Budget Committee as part of the FY 2024-25 budget package. Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1421 Budget Year FY 2024-25 Out Year FY 2025-26 Revenue - - Expenditures - - Transfers General Fund ($3.0 million) - Cash Funds $3.0 million - Net Transfer $0 - Other Budget Impacts - - Page 2 May 15, 2024 HB 24-1421 Summary of Legislation The bill modifies the funding structure of three grant programs in the Department of Public Safety (CDPS). The grant programs are the: Multidisciplinary Crime Prevention and Crisis Intervention (MCPCI) Program; Law Enforcement Workforce Recruitment, Retention, and Tuition Program; and State’s Mission for Assistance in Recruiting and Training (SMART) Program. Each program has a corresponding cash fund that, under current law, is continuously appropriated. The bill makes each cash fund subject to annual appropriations, transfers $3.0 million from the General Fund to the MCPCI Grant Fund on July 1, 2024, and makes FY 2024-25 appropriations from each cash fund to the CDPS for the grant programs. Additionally, the bill requires law enforcement agencies to meet certain reporting requirements to maintain eligibility for grant awards. Finally, the bill continues the MCPCI program, which is scheduled to repeal on January 1, 2025, for one and a half years, until July 1, 2027. Background All three grant programs were created through Senate Bill 22-145. More information about these CDPS grant programs can be found here. State Transfers In FY 2024-25 only, the bill transfers $3.0 million from the General Fund to the MCPCI Grant Fund in the CDPS. State Expenditures The bill is expected to increase state expenditures from the MCPCI Grant Fund by $3.0 million. Future program funding is at the discretion of the General Assembly. Effective Date This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect April 29, 2024. State Appropriations For FY 2024-25, the bill includes the following appropriations to the Department of Public Safety: $3,868,229 from the MCPCI Grant Fund; $3,593,030 from the Law Enforcement Workforce Recruitment, Retention, and Training Grant Fund; and Page 3 May 15, 2024 HB 24-1421 $7,031,919 from the SMART Grant Fund. State and Local Government Contacts Joint Budget Committee Staff Public Safety The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.