Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1421 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/15/2024

                    Page 1 
May 15, 2024   HB 24-1421 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1111  
Rep. Bird; Taggart 
Sen. Zenzinger; Kirkmeyer  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 15, 2024  
Signed into Law  
Clayton Mayfield | 303-866-5851 
clayton.mayfield@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: MODIFYING PUBLIC SAFETY PROGRAM FUNDING  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Budget package bill. The bill transfers $3.0 million from the General Fund to the 
Multidisciplinary Crime Prevention and Crisis Intervention Grant Fund in the 
Department of Public Safety and continues the program through FY 2026-27; modifies 
the appropriation authority of this and other CDPS funds; and makes appropriations. 
The bill increases state expenditures in FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill includes appropriations totaling $14.5 million to the 
Department of Public Safety; see State Appropriations section. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. The bill was recommended by the Joint 
Budget Committee as part of the FY 2024-25 budget package. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1421 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures  	- 	- 
Transfers 	General Fund 	($3.0 million)  	-  
 	Cash Funds 	$3.0 million 	- 
 	Net Transfer 	$0 	- 
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
   Page 2 
May 15, 2024   HB 24-1421 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill modifies the funding structure of three grant programs in the Department of Public 
Safety (CDPS). The grant programs are the: 
 Multidisciplinary Crime Prevention and Crisis Intervention (MCPCI) Program; 
 Law Enforcement Workforce Recruitment, Retention, and Tuition Program; and 
 State’s Mission for Assistance in Recruiting and Training (SMART) Program. 
Each program has a corresponding cash fund that, under current law, is continuously 
appropriated. The bill makes each cash fund subject to annual appropriations, transfers 
$3.0 million from the General Fund to the MCPCI Grant Fund on July 1, 2024, and makes 
FY 2024-25 appropriations from each cash fund to the CDPS for the grant programs. 
Additionally, the bill requires law enforcement agencies to meet certain reporting requirements 
to maintain eligibility for grant awards.  
Finally, the bill continues the MCPCI program, which is scheduled to repeal on January 1, 2025, 
for one and a half years, until July 1, 2027.  
Background 
All three grant programs were created through Senate Bill 22-145. More information about 
these CDPS grant programs can be found here. 
State Transfers 
In FY 2024-25 only, the bill transfers $3.0 million from the General Fund to the MCPCI Grant 
Fund in the CDPS. 
State Expenditures 
The bill is expected to increase state expenditures from the MCPCI Grant Fund by $3.0 million. 
Future program funding is at the discretion of the General Assembly. 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect April 29, 2024. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill includes the following appropriations to the Department of Public 
Safety: 
 $3,868,229 from the MCPCI Grant Fund; 
 $3,593,030 from the Law Enforcement Workforce Recruitment, Retention, and Training Grant 
Fund; and  Page 3 
May 15, 2024   HB 24-1421 
 
 
 $7,031,919 from the SMART Grant Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Joint Budget Committee Staff    Public Safety 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.