Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REREVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the Second House LLS NO. 24-1126.01 Chelsea Princell x4335 HOUSE BILL 24-1431 House Committees Senate Committees Health & Human Services Health & Human Services Appropriations Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING THE CREATION OF A PROGRAM TO PROVIDE STABLE101 HOUSING ASSISTANCE FOR SURVIVORS OF ABUSE , AND, IN102 CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill creates the stable housing for survivors of domestic or sexual violence program (program) in the department of human services (state department). SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended May 6, 2024 SENATE 2nd Reading Unamended May 4, 2024 HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended April 25, 2024 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading April 24, 2024 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Lukens and Armagost, Amabile, Bacon, Bird, Boesenecker, Duran, English, Epps, Froelich, Garcia, Hamrick, Hernandez, Herod, Jodeh, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Mabrey, Mauro, McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Ortiz, Pugliese, Ricks, Rutinel, Sirota, Snyder, Story, Titone, Weissman, Woodrow, Young SENATE SPONSORSHIP Winter F. and Michaelson Jenet, Bridges, Buckner, Cutter, Exum, Ginal, Jaquez Lewis, Mullica, Priola, Roberts, Sullivan, Zenzinger Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. The bill requires the state department to contract with community-based advocacy organizations to provide short-term assistance payments to survivors of domestic or sexual violence for stable housing. For each state fiscal year 2024-25 through 2028-29, the bill requires the general assembly to appropriate $2 million from the state long-term works reserve to the program. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. Legislative declaration. (1) The general assembly2 finds that:3 (a) Domestic and sexual violence inflicts profound and enduring4 harm on children, youth, and their caregivers, with economic abuse tactics5 often exacerbating the challenges survivors of domestic and sexual6 violence often face in escaping their abusive environments;7 (b) Stable housing is paramount for individuals who escape8 abusive environments, with rapid rehousing programs playing a crucial9 role in addressing homelessness among survivors of domestic and sexual10 violence and their children;11 (c) Providing timely financial assistance for housing expenses to12 survivors of domestic and sexual violence significantly enhances the13 safety and well-being of affected households;14 (d) The domestic violence program within the department of15 human services utilized federal "American Rescue Plan Act of 2021"16 (ARPA), Pub.L. 117-2 funds to administer a time-limited flex fund17 project to help survivors of domestic and sexual violence overcome18 barriers to safety and recovery. Data from this ARPA-funded flexible19 funding project emphasizes the critical need for housing support among20 survivors of domestic and sexual violence.21 (e) Community organizations that provide crisis intervention22 1431-2- services are well-positioned to provide the financial support survivors of1 domestic and sexual violence need to overcome housing barriers and2 establish a sense of safety and stability for themselves and their children;3 and4 (f) Individuals who have experienced domestic or sexual violence5 make up a disproportionate share of the TANF program caseload, which6 highlights the intersecting challenges faced by survivors of domestic and7 sexual violence and their children.8 (2) Therefore, the general assembly declares that using unused9 Colorado works program state money to establish and execute a10 housing-focused flexible financial assistance project for domestic and11 sexual violence survivors is a proactive and effective solution to address12 the immediate needs of this vulnerable population.13 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 26-2-726 as14 follows:15 26-2-726. Stable housing for survivors of domestic or sexual16 violence program - creation - funding - appropriation - definitions.17 (1) A S USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE18 REQUIRES:19 (a) "C ONTRACTED ORGANIZATION " MEANS A COMMUNITY20 ORGANIZATION THAT THE STATE DEPARTMENT CONTRACTS WITH TO21 PROVIDE STABLE HOUSING SUPPORT TO SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC OR22 SEXUAL VIOLENCE WHO ARE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED23 PURSUANT TO THE COLORADO WORKS PROGRAM THR OUGH THE PROGRAM .24 (b) "P ROGRAM" MEANS THE STABLE HOUSING FOR SURVIVORS OF25 DOMESTIC OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROGRAM CREATED IN SUBSECTION (2) OF26 THIS SECTION.27 1431 -3- (c) "SHORT-TERM ASSISTANCE PAYMENT " HAS THE MEANING SET1 FORTH IN SECTION 26-2-706.6 (3).2 (2) T HERE IS CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES3 THE STABLE HOUSING FOR SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE4 PROGRAM TO PROVIDE STABLE HOUSING SUPPORT TO SURVIVORS OF5 DOMESTIC OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE WHO ARE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE6 PROVIDED PURSUANT TO THE COLORADO WORKS PROGRAM .7 (3) O N OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE STATE DEPARTMENT8 SHALL CONTRACT WITH COMMUNITY -BASED ADVOCACY ORGANIZATIONS9 TO IMPLEMENT THE PROGRAM .10 (4) A CONTRACTED ORGANIZATION SHALL USE THE MONEY11 ALLOCATED TO IT BY THE STATE DEPARTMENT TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL12 SUPPORT TO A SURVIVOR OF DOMESTIC OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE WHO IS13 ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE COLORADO WORKS PROGRAM14 TO OBTAIN A SHORT-TERM ASSISTANCE PAYMENT FOR STABLE HOUSING .15 (5) F OR EACH STATE FISCAL YEAR 2024-25 THROUGH 2028-29, THE16 GENERAL ASSEMBLY SHALL APPROPRIATE TWO MILLION DOLLARS FROM17 THE COLORADO LONG-TERM WORKS RESERVE , CREATED IN SECTION18 26-2-721, TO THE PROGRAM.19 (6) T HE COLORADO WORKS PROGRAM SHALL ACCOUNT FOR THE20 FUNDS USED FOR THE PROGRAM IN ITS ANNUAL COLORADO WORKS REPORT21 SUBMITTED TO THE JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE .22 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-2-721, amend (2)23 introductory portion; and add (2)(c) as follows:24 26-2-721. Colorado long-term works reserve - creation - use.25 (2) The general assembly, upon request of the state department, may26 appropriate the moneys MONEY in the reserve for the purposes of:27 1431 -4- (c) THE STABLE HOUSING FOR SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC OR SE XUAL1 VIOLENCE PROGRAM CREATED IN SECTION 26-2-726.2 SECTION 4. Appropriation. For the 2024-25 state fiscal year,3 $2,000,000 is appropriated to the department of human services for use4 by the office of economic security. This appropriation is from the5 Colorado long-term works reserve created in section 26-2-721 (1), C.R.S.,6 and is based on the assumption that the office will require an additional7 1.3 FTE. To implement this act, the office may use this appropriation8 for the stable housing for survivors of domestic or sexual violence9 program.10 SECTION 5. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,11 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate12 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for13 the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state14 institutions.15 1431 -5-