Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REREVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the Second House LLS NO. 24-0446.01 Yelana Love x2295 SENATE BILL 24-019 Senate Committees House Committees Finance Transportation, Housing & Local Government Appropriations Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING REMUNERATION -EXEMPT IDENTIFYING PLACARDS , AND, 101 IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .102 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) Current law exempts an individual with a remuneration-exempt identifying placard from paying at a parking device. The bill defines "parking device" as a single- or multi-space meter, kiosk, pay station, pay-by-space, pay-by-plate, pay-by-card, or other payment system or methodology for the parking of vehicles. The bill also: HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended April 22, 2024 HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended April 22, 2024 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading April 20, 2024 SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended March 15, 2024 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading March 13, 2024 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Smallwood and Kolker, Fields, Gonzales, Marchman, Priola HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Vigil and Soper, Boesenecker, Herod, Kipp, Lindsay, Mabrey Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Clarifies that a remuneration-exempt parking placard does not count toward the limits on the number of disability identifying placards and license plates the department of revenue (department) may issue to an individual; ! Increases the number of remuneration-exempt placards that the department may issue to an individual from one placard to 2 placards; and ! Specifies that an individual with a placard is exempt from paying at a parking device within a parking lot. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 42-3-204, amend2 (3)(b)(I)(B); and add (1)(g.5) as follows:3 42-3-204. Reserved parking for persons with disabilities -4 applicability - definitions - rules. (1) Definitions. As used in this5 section:6 (g.5) "P ARKING DEVICE" MEANS A SINGLE- OR MULTI-SPACE7 METER, KIOSK, PAY STATION , PAY-BY-SPACE, PAY-BY-PLATE,8 PAY-BY-CARD, OR OTHER PAYMENT SYSTEM OR METHODOLOGY FOR THE9 PARKING OF VEHICLES.10 (3) Types of plates or placards. (b) Number of placards and11 license plates allowed. (I) (B) The department may issue one TWO12 remuneration-exempt identifying placard PLACARDS to an eligible13 individual. A REMUNERATION-EXEMPT IDENTIFYING PLACARD DOES NOT14 COUNT TOWARD THE LIMITS ON PLACARDS AND PLATES SPECIFIED IN15 SUBSECTION (3)(b)(I)(A) OF THIS SECTION.16 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 42-4-1212, amend17 (1) as follows:18 42-4-1212. Pay parking access for persons with disabilities.19 (1) A person who owns, operates, or manages a parking space,20 019-2- INCLUDING A PARKING SPACE WITHIN A PARKING LOT , that requires1 remuneration PAID THROUGH A PARKING DEVICE shall not tow, boot, or2 otherwise take adverse action against an individual or motor vehicle3 parking in the space for failure to pay the remuneration if the motor4 vehicle bears a remuneration-exempt identifying placard issued pursuant5 to section 42-3-204.6 SECTION 3. Appropriation. (1) For the 2024-25 state fiscal 7 year, $10,447 is appropriated to the department of revenue. This8 appropriation is from the Colorado DRIVES vehicle services account in9 the highway users tax fund created in section 42-1-211 (2), C.R.S. To10 implement this act, the department may use this appropriation as follows:11 (a) $7,936 for DRIVES maintenance and support;12 (b) $384 for personal services related to vehicle services; 13 (c) $840 for personal services related to administration and14 support; and15 (d) $1,287 for payments to OIT.16 (2) For the 2024-25 state fiscal year, $335 is appropriated to the17 department of revenue for use by the division of motor vehicles. This18 appropriation is from the license plate cash fund created in section19 42-3-301 (1)(b), C.R.S. To implement this act, the division may use this20 appropriation for license plate ordering.21 22 SECTION 4. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act23 takes effect November 1, 2024; except that, if a referendum petition is24 filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against25 this act or an item, section, or part of this act within the ninety-day period26 after final adjournment of the general assembly, then the act, item,27 019 -3- section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the1 general election to be held in November 2024 and, in such case, will take2 effect on the date of the official declaration of the vote thereon by the3 governor.4 019 -4-