Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB019 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/29/2024

                    Page 1 
March 29, 2024 
 
 SB 24-019 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 23, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0446  
Sen. Smallwood; Kolker 
Rep. Vigil; Soper  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 29, 2024 
House Trans., Hous. & Local Govt.  
Nina Forbes | 303-866-4785 
nina.forbes@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: REMUNERATION-EXEMPT IDENTIFYING PLACARDS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill expands and clarifies access to remuneration-exempt placards. The bill 
increases state expenditures in FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill includes an appropriation of $10,782 to the Department of 
Revenue. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-019 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$10,782  $10,843  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
   Page 2 
March 29, 2024 
 
 SB 24-019 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, individuals with remuneration-exempt placards are exempt from paying at a 
parking device. The bill defines “parking device” and makes clarifications regarding 
remuneration-exempt placards as follows: 
 it increases the number of remuneration-exempt placards that the Department of Revenue 
(DOR) may issue from one to two per person; 
 it clarifies that a remuneration-exempt placard is not included in the limits on disability 
identifying placards and license plates that the DOR may issue to an individual; and 
 it specifies that individuals with remuneration-exempt placards are exempt from paying at a 
parking device within a parking lot.  
Background and Assumptions 
Remuneration-exempt placards. Identifying placards, including remuneration-exempt 
placards, are issued to eligible individuals at no cost. More information about 
remuneration-exempt placards is available on the DOR’s website. 
 
DRIVES programming. The Division of Motor Vehicles (DMV) in the DOR uses its Driver 
License, Record, Identification and Vehicle Enterprise Solution (DRIVES) information technology 
system for all driver license and motor vehicle transactions. The DRIVES system requires an 
extensive 18-month upgrade which is scheduled to take place from July 1, 2024, through 
March 31, 2026. As a result, the DOR has requested that any new legislation requiring DRIVES 
programming have an effective date of April 1, 2026, with roll-forward spending authority 
through FY 2026-27, noting that each programming requirement during the system upgrade 
period may increase the overall project timeline. Based on the current effective date in the bill, 
the fiscal note includes costs for the DRIVES programming to take place twice—in the existing 
and new system.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state cash fund expenditures by $10,782 in FY 2024-25 and $10,843 in 
FY 2025-26. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and discussed below. 
Table 2 
State Expenditures Under SB 24-019 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Revenue                
DRIVES Programming 	$10,447 $10,671 
Placards 	$335 $172 
Total Expenditures 	$10,782 $10,843 
  Page 3 
March 29, 2024 
 
 SB 24-019 
 
 
DRIVES programming. Programming and testing costs of $9,160 in FY 2024-25 and $9,384 in 
FY 2025-26 are required to update the Driver License, Record, Identification and Vehicle 
Enterprise Solutions (DRIVES) system. Office of Information Technology (OIT) support 
requirements are estimated at 13 hours at a rate of $99 per hour for a total cost of $1,287, which 
will be allocated to the DOR and paid to OIT via real time billing in each year. These costs are 
paid from the DRIVES Cash Fund. 
Additional placards. Based on the number of existing remuneration-exempt placards the DOR 
currently issues, the department will produce an estimated 744 additional placards in 
FY 2024-25 and 220 additional placards in FY 2025-26 at a cost of $0.45 per placard. These costs 
are paid from the License Plate Cash Fund. 
Technical Note 
The fiscal note currently includes a duplicative programming cost for the DOR’s DRIVES system, 
as discussed in the Background and Assumptions section. The duplicate cost would be removed 
if the bill’s effective date were amended to April 1, 2026, when the DRIVES upgrade is complete.   
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill includes the following appropriations to the Department of Revenue: 
 $10,447 from the DRIVES Account; and 
 $335 from the License Plate Cash Fund.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Revenue  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.