Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB037 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/11/2024

                    Page 1 
January 10, 2023 	SB 24-037   
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0365  
Sen. Simpson; Bridges 
Rep. Lynch; McCormick 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
January 10, 2024 
Senate Agriculture 
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: STUDY GREEN INFRASTRUCTURE FOR WATER QUALITY M ANAGEMENT 
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment to 
conduct a feasibility study and create demonstration projects of green infrastructure 
as an alternative compliance mechanism for water quality compliance. The bill 
increases state expenditures beginning FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $914,129 to the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as requested by the Water Resources and 
Agriculture Review Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB24-037 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Out Year 
FY 2026-27 
Revenue  	-     - 	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund $914,129  $663,113  $552,123  
 
Centrally Appropriated $91,932  $82,200  $58,015  
 
Total Expenditures $1,006,061  $745,313  $610,137  
 	Total FTE 4.6 FTE 4.0 FTE 2.7 FTE 
Transfers  	-  - 	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $137,119  $99,467  $82,818   Page 2 
January 10, 2023 	SB 24-037   
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires that the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) study 
the feasibility of substituting green infrastructure, a planned and managed network of natural 
green spaces, for traditional centralized wastewater and drinking water treatment mechanisms. 
The study must determine if green infrastructure: 
 
 is feasible as an alternative compliance mechanism for water providers that can be aligned 
with other state and local interests, including wildfire mitigation; 
 attracts new sources of environmental-focused funding for water quality compliance and for 
water infrastructure projects; and 
 creates cost savings for the CDPHE and local water providers. 
  
The feasibility study must be completed by December 31, 2025. A progress report on the study 
must be presented by July 1, 2025 to the Water Resources and Agriculture Review Committee. 
After completing the study, the CDPHE must establish one or more pilot programs to 
demonstrate the use of green infrastructure as an alternative compliance program supported 
with environmental-focused funding. The CDPHE must coordinate with the University of 
Colorado (CU) and Colorado State University (CSU) to conduct the study and to develop and 
provide technical assistance to the pilot programs. 
 
No later than December 31, 2025, the Water Quality Control Commission in the CDPHE must 
consult with higher education partners and a representative group of interested parties to adopt 
rules that establish pre-permit baseline data allowing an operator using nature-based solutions 
to demonstrate water quality compliance to state and federal regulators. The bill is repealed 
September 1, 2032. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by about $682,000 in FY 2024-25, about 
$585,000 in FY 2025-26, and about $610,000 in FY 2026-27, paid from the General Fund. 
Expenditures in FY 2024-25 are primarily to conduct the feasibility study. Costs in future fiscal 
years are for pilot and demonstration projects. New costs are displayed in Table 2 and discussed 
below. 
 
   Page 3 
January 10, 2023 	SB 24-037   
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB24-037 
 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 
Department of Public Health and Environment    
Personal Services 	$428,024  $397,861  $299,482  
Operating Expenses 	$5,760  $4,992  $3,327  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$33,350  $20,010  $20,010  
Legal Services 	$29,445  $29,445  $16,643  
Contracted Technical and Specialized Assistance $417,550  $208,950  $208,950  
Site Visit Travel & Per Diem 	- $1,855  $3,710  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$91,932  $82,200  $58,015  
FTE – Personal Services 	4.5 FTE 3.9 FTE 2.6 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.1 FTE 0.1 FTE 0.1 FTE 
Total Cost
 
$1,006,061  $745,313  $610,137  
Total FTE 4.6 FTE 4.0 FTE 2.7 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
The CDPHE requires additional staff and will contract outside vendor(s) for additional specialized 
and technical support beginning FY 2024-25. Staff and contractor(s) are necessary to complete 
the feasibility study and prepare a final report and recommendations for pilot programs by 
December 2025. Additional staff and vendor support is also necessary beginning in FY 2024-25 
to create rules and develop the program, and to launch and manage pilot projects beginning 
sometime after the feasibility study in FY 2025-26.  
 
Personal services. In FY 2024-25, 1.9 FTE Environmental Specialist will analyze existing federal, 
state and local policies, investigate green infrastructure funding options and potential investors, 
evaluate community interests and goals, assess alternative legislative and administrative actions 
necessary for alternative compliance mechanisms, coordinate and manage technical assistance 
from outside vendor(s), and prepare and present reports. Approximately 3 FTE are required for 
rule making and project program development, through December 2026 (18 months). This 
process includes statewide stakeholder meetings, preparing a statement of basis and purpose, 
formal submission, drafting and revisions, coordinating with contractor(s) and adopting final 
rules in time to launch demonstration projects. A total of 2.5 FTE Professional Engineer are 
required beginning FY 2025-26 to implement pilot programs, manage additional rulemaking 
and permitting for discharge variance, coordinate with project participants and vendor(s), and to 
evaluate scientific and regulatory impacts.   
 
Legal services. The CDPHE requires additional legal services provided by the Department of Law 
to conduct the feasibility study, and to implement the pilot programs, estimated at 230 hours in 
FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26, and decreasing thereafter to 130 hours annually.  Page 4 
January 10, 2023 	SB 24-037   
 
 
Contracted technical and specialized assistance. The CDPHE will contract with outside subject 
matter experts, facilitators, and other experts to conduct rulemaking, prepare the feasibility 
study, and manage pilot projects. These contracts are expected to total 1,200 hours in 
FY 2024-25, and about 600 hours in FY 2025-26 and thereafter, at a rate of $350 per hour. 
 
Site visit travel and per diem. Beginning FY 2025-26, staff will require mileage reimbursement 
and hotel and per diem costs for statewide site visits to pilot projects. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $914,129 to the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment, and 4.6 FTE. Of this amount, $29,455 is 
reappropriated to the Department of Law, and 0.1 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Public Health and Environment   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.