Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB037 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/18/2024

                    Page 1 
April 18, 2024 	SB 24-037   
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated March 18, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0365  
Sen. Simpson; Bridges 
Rep. Lynch; McCormick 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 18, 2024 
House Ag., Water & Natural Res. 
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov 
 
Bill Topic: STUDY GREEN INFRASTRUCTURE FOR WATER QUALITY MANAGEMENT 
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires that the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment, in 
collaboration with institutions of higher education, conduct a feasibility study and 
create demonstration projects of green infrastructure as an alternative compliance 
mechanism for water quality compliance. The bill increases state expenditures 
beginning FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $50,651 to the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-037 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Out Year 
FY 2026-27 
Revenue  	-     - -     
Expenditures 	General Fund $50,651  $70,584  $56,233  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$7,873  $10,209  $10,209  
 
Total Expenditures $58,524  $80,793  $66,442  
 	Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.6 FTE 0.5 FTE 
Transfers  	-  - -  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$7,598  $10,588  $8,435   Page 2 
April 18, 2024 	SB 24-037   
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires that the University of Colorado and Colorado State University collaborate with 
the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) to study the feasibility of 
substituting green infrastructure, a planned and managed network of natural green spaces, for 
traditional centralized wastewater and drinking water treatment mechanisms. The study must 
determine if green infrastructure: 
 is feasible as an alternative compliance mechanism for water providers that can be aligned 
with other state and local interests, including wildfire mitigation; 
 attracts new sources of environmental-focused funding for water quality compliance and for 
water infrastructure projects; and 
 creates cost savings for the CDPHE and local water providers. 
The feasibility study must begin by October 1, 2024. The universities and CDPHE must complete 
the study by July 1, 2025, and report findings to the Water Resources and Agriculture Review 
Committee. Following the study, and with approval of CDPHE, the universities may establish up 
to three pilot projects to demonstrate the use of green infrastructure as an alternative 
compliance program supported with environmental-focused funding.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by about $59,000 in FY 2024-25, about 
$81,000 in FY 2025-26, and about $66,000 in FY 2026-27, paid from the General Fund. 
Expenditures in FY 2024-25 are primarily to conduct the feasibility study. Costs in future fiscal 
years are for oversight and management of pilot and demonstration projects. New costs are 
displayed in Table 2 and discussed below. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 24-037 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 
Department of Public Health and Environment    
Personal Services 	$34,777  $47,404  $47,404  
Operating Expenses 	$512  $640  $640  
Capital Outlay Costs 	- $6,670  	- 
Legal Services 	$15,362  $15,362  	-  
Site Visit Travel & Per Diem 	- $508  $508  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$7,873  $10,209  $10,209  
FTE – Personal Services 	0.4 FTE 0.5 FTE 0.5 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.1 FTE 0.1 FTE 	- 
Total Cost
 
$58,524  
 
$80,793  $58,761  
Total FTE 0.5 FTE 0.6 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
  Page 3 
April 18, 2024 	SB 24-037   
 
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. The CDPHE requires additional staff and will 
contract outside vendor(s) for additional specialized and technical support beginning 
FY 2024-25. Staff and contractor(s) are necessary to complete the feasibility study and prepare a 
final report and recommendations for pilot programs by July 2025. Staff is also necessary to 
launch and manage pilot projects beginning sometime after the feasibility study is completed.   
 Personal services. In FY 2024-25, 0.5 FTE Environmental Specialist will work with the 
universities to analyze existing federal, state and local policies, investigate green 
infrastructure funding options and potential investors, evaluate community interests and 
goals, assess alternative legislative and administrative actions necessary for alternative 
compliance mechanisms, coordinate and manage technical assistance from outside 
vendor(s), and prepare and present reports.  
 Legal services. The CDPHE requires additional legal services provided by the Department of 
Law to conduct the feasibility study, and to implement the pilot programs, estimated at 
120 hours in FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26, and decreasing thereafter to 60 hours annually. 
 Contracted technical and specialized assistance. The CDPHE will contract with state 
institutions of higher education to prepare the feasibility study and manage pilot projects. 
This assistance is provided by the institutions using existing research funds available to the 
schools, and requires no additional state appropriations. 
 Site visit travel and per diem. Beginning FY 2025-26, staff will require mileage 
reimbursement and hotel and per diem costs for statewide site visits to pilot projects. 
 Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. 
These costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement 
payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Institutions of Higher Education. The CDPHE will collaborate with existing projects and research 
activities occurring at the University of Colorado, and at Colorado State University. These efforts 
are currently funded and require no additional appropriations. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
   Page 4 
April 18, 2024 	SB 24-037   
 
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $50,651 to the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment, and 0.4 FTE. Of this amount, $15,362 is 
reappropriated to the Department of Law, with an additional 0.1 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Public Health and Environment   Law 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.