Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/26/2024

                    Page 1 
January 25, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0065  
Sen. Buckner; Fields 
Rep. English  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
January 25, 2024 
Senate Health & Human Services  
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SICKLE CELL DISEASE COMMUNITY OUTREACH & SERVICES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a program that provides outreach and support services to individuals 
with sickle cell disease. The bill increases state expenditures from FY 2024-25 to 
FY 2029-30. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $505,850 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-042 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$505,850     $512,313 
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$6,976 $8,719 
 
Total Expenditures 	$512,826     $521,032 
 	Total FTE 	0.4 FTE  0.5 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$75,878 $76,847 
   Page 2 
January 25, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Arie P. Taylor Sickle Cell Disease Outreach Program in the Department of 
Public Health and Environment (CDPHE). The CDPHE will contract with one or more nonprofit 
organizations to deliver outreach and support services to individuals with sickle cell disease. 
By January 1, 2025, CDPHE must contract a third-party administrator to solicit applications for 
the program, present the qualified applicants to CDPHE, and administer the contracts. The bill 
outlines the criteria for the contracted organization(s) and the types of outreach and services 
that can be provided. The CDPHE may consult with the Colorado Sickle Cell Treatment and 
Research Center to determine if additional services should be included. The CDPHE must 
provide reports prepared by the contracted organization(s) to the General Assembly. The 
program is repealed July 1, 2030.  
Assumptions 
The bill does not specify the funding available to the CDPHE to provide for the contracted 
services delivered by the program, which is at the discretion of the General Assembly. The fiscal 
note assumes $416,000 will be made available annually for the services offered by the program. 
State Expenditures 
Beginning FY 2024-25 and continuing through the duration of the program until FY 2029-30, the 
bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by approximately $520,000 per year, paid from 
the General Fund. It also minimally increases workload for the Department of Higher Education. 
Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and described below. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 24-042 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Public Health and Environment   
Personal Services 	$25,338       $31,673 
Operating Expenses 	$512 	$640 
Third-Party Administrator 	$64,000 $64,000 
Contracts with Organizations 	$416,000 $416,000 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$6,976       $8,719 
Total Cost $512,826 $521,032 
Total FTE 0.4 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
   Page 3 
January 25, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. From FY 2024-25 to FY 2029-30, the CDHPE 
requires staff and contracts with third-party entities to implement the program.  
 Staff.  The CDPHE requires 0.5 FTE to procure and manage the contract for the third-party 
administrator and provide continued fiscal oversight of the program and contracts with 
organizations. Staff costs are prorated the first year for a September 1, 2024, start date. 
 Third-party administrator. The CDPHE requires an annual contract with a third-party 
administrator to manage the program including soliciting organizations, reviewing and 
selecting organizations, and collecting data and preparing reports on the program with the 
organizations. The administrator contract is estimated to require 320 hours (about 2 weeks) 
annually at a rate of $200 per hour.  
 Contracts with organizations. The fiscal note assumes CDPHE will contract with two 
organizations at a rate of $100 per hour. To fund the equivalent of one FTE’s worth of work 
at each organization would require $416,000 annually.  
Table 3 
Contract Service Provision 
Outreach and Support Services Provided 	Hours per year 
Informal counseling and guidance 	500 
Support for locating and accessing services 	500 
Outreach to individuals and families 	200 
Peer support and referrals 	400 
Advocacy 	100 
Referrals for screening 
 
200 
Additional services identified by the CDPHE 	100 
Reporting to the CDPHE  	80 
Total 	2080 Hours 
 
University of Colorado, School of Medicine. Workload will increase for the Colorado Sickle 
Cell Treatment and Research Center to assist the CDHPE in determining effective sickle cell 
services and supports. This workload is minimal and can be accommodated within existing 
resources.  
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2.  Page 4 
January 25, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $505,850 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment, and 0.4 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Higher Education    Law    Public Health and Environment  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.