Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/09/2024

                    Page 1 
February 9, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 25, 2024)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0065  
Sen. Buckner; Fields 
Rep. English  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 9, 2024 
Senate Appropriations  
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SICKLE CELL DISEASE COMMUNITY OUTREACH & SERVICES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a program that provides outreach and support services to individuals 
with sickle cell disease. The bill increases state expenditures from FY 2024-25 to 
FY 2029-30. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $448,520 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-042 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$448,520 $448,313 
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$6,988 $8,734 
 
Total Expenditures 	$455,508 $457,047 
 	Total FTE 	0.4 FTE  0.5 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$67,278 $67,247 
   Page 2 
February 9, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Arie P. Taylor Sickle Cell Disease Outreach Program in the Department of 
Public Health and Environment (CDPHE). The CDPHE will contract with one or more nonprofit 
organizations to deliver outreach and support services to individuals with sickle cell disease. 
By January 1, 2025, CDPHE must solicit and administer contracts with organizations for the 
program. The bill outlines the criteria for the contracted organization(s) and the types of 
outreach and services that can be provided. The CDPHE may consult with the Colorado Sickle 
Cell Treatment and Research Center to determine if additional services should be included. The 
CDPHE must provide reports prepared by the contracted organization(s) to the General 
Assembly. The program is repealed July 1, 2030.  
Assumptions 
The bill does not specify the funding available to the CDPHE to provide for the contracted 
services delivered by the program, which is at the discretion of the General Assembly. The fiscal 
note assumes $416,000 will be made available annually for the services offered by the program. 
State Expenditures 
Beginning FY 2024-25 and continuing through the duration of the program until FY 2029-30, the 
bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by approximately $450,000 per year, paid from 
the General Fund. It also minimally increases workload for the Department of Higher Education 
and Department of Law. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and described below. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 24-042 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Public Health and Environment   
Personal Services 	$25,338       $31,673 
Operating Expenses 	$512 	$640 
Capital Outlay  	$6,670 	- 
Contracts with Organizations 	$416,000 $416,000 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$6,976       $8,719 
Total Cost $455,508 $457,047 
Total FTE 0.4 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
   Page 3 
February 9, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. From FY 2024-25 to FY 2029-30, the CDHPE 
requires staff and contracts with organizations to implement the program.  
 Staff.  The CDPHE requires 0.5 FTE to provide fiscal and administrative oversight of the 
program, including procuring and managing contracts with organizations. Staff costs are 
prorated the first year for a September 1, 2024, start date. 
 Contracts with organizations. The CDPHE is assumed to require $416,000 annually to 
contract with community-based nonprofit organizations that will provide the outreach and 
services outlined in the bill. The fiscal note assumes CDPHE will contract with two 
organizations, and each organization will provide 2,080 hours of the services listed in Table 3 
at an average cost of $100 per hour. These funding levels and service offerings are 
assumptions only; actual funding will be determined by the General Assembly, and service 
provision will be adjusted accordingly. 
Table 3 
Contract Service Provision 
Outreach and Support Services Provided 	Hours per year 
Informal counseling and guidance 	500 
Support for locating and accessing services 	500 
Outreach to individuals and families 	200 
Peer support and referrals 	400 
Advocacy 	100 
Referrals for screening 
 
200 
Additional services identified by the CDPHE 	100 
Reporting to the CDPHE  	80 
Total 	2080 Hours 
 
University of Colorado, School of Medicine. Workload will increase for the Colorado Sickle 
Cell Treatment and Research Center to assist the CDHPE in determining effective sickle cell 
services and supports. This workload is minimal and can be accommodated within existing 
resources.  
Department of Law. Workload will minimally increase for the department to provide general 
counsel and rulemaking support to the CDPHE. This can be accommodated within existing 
resources. 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2.  Page 4 
February 9, 2024  SB 24-042 
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $448,520 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment, and 0.4 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Higher Education      Law      Public Health and Environment    
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.