Page 1 April 16, 2024 SB 24-042 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Revised Fiscal Note (replaces fiscal note dated February 9, 2024) Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 24-0065 Sen. Buckner; Fields Rep. English Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: April 16, 2024 Senate Second Reading Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov Bill Topic: SICKLE CELL DISEASE COMMUNITY OUTREACH & SERVICES Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☐ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity The bill creates a program that provides outreach and support services to individuals with sickle cell disease. The bill increases state expenditures from FY 2024-25 to FY 2029-30. Appropriation Summary: For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $200,000 to the Department of Public Health and Environment. Fiscal Note Status: The revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the Senate Health and Human Services Committee and Senate Appropriations Committee. Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-042 Budget Year FY 2024-25 Out Year FY 2025-26 Revenue - - Expenditures General Fund $200,000 $200,000 Centrally Appropriated $1,747 $3,494 Total Expenditures $201,747 $203,494 Total FTE 0.1 FTE 0.2 FTE Transfers - - Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $30,000 $30,000 Page 2 April 16, 2024 SB 24-042 Summary of Legislation The bill creates the Arie P. Taylor Sickle Cell Disease Outreach Program in the Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE). The CDPHE will contract with one or more nonprofit organizations to deliver outreach and support services to individuals with sickle cell disease. By January 1, 2025, CDPHE must solicit and administer contracts with organizations for the program. The bill outlines the criteria for the contracted organization(s) and the types of outreach and services that can be provided. The CDPHE may consult with the Colorado Sickle Cell Treatment and Research Center to determine if additional services should be included. The CDPHE must provide reports prepared by the contracted organization(s) to the General Assembly. The program is repealed July 1, 2030. The bill appropriates $200,000 for the program from the General Fund in FY 2024-25 and caps administrative costs at up to 8 percent of the appropriation, or $16,000. Assumptions The bill appropriates one-time funding for the program; however, the fiscal note assumes $200,000 will be made available annually for the services offered by the program until its repeal. State Expenditures Beginning FY 2024-25 and continuing through the duration of the program until FY 2029-30, the bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by about $200,000 per year, paid from the General Fund. It also minimally increases workload for the Department of Higher Education and Department of Law. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and described below. Table 2 Expenditures Under SB 24-042 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 Department of Public Health and Environment Personal Services $6,335 $12,669 Contracts with Organizations $193,665 $187,331 Centrally Appropriated Costs 1 $1,747 $3,494 Total Cost $201,747 $203,494 Total FTE 0.1 FTE 0.2 FTE 1 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. Page 3 April 16, 2024 SB 24-042 Department of Public Health and Environment. From FY 2024-25 to FY 2029-30, the CDHPE requires staff and contracts with organizations to implement the program. Staff. The CDPHE requires 0.2 FTE to provide fiscal and administrative oversight of the program, including procuring and managing contracts with organizations. Staff costs are prorated the first year for a December 1, 2024, start date. Contracts with organizations. After administrative costs, approximately $190,000 per year is expected to be available for the CDPHE to contract with community-based nonprofit organizations that will provide the outreach and services outlined in the bill from FY 2024-25 to FY 2029-30. University of Colorado, School of Medicine. Workload will increase for the Colorado Sickle Cell Treatment and Research Center to assist the CDHPE in determining effective sickle cell services and supports. This workload is minimal and can be accommodated within existing resources. Department of Law. Workload will minimally increase for the department to provide general counsel and rulemaking support to the CDPHE. This can be accommodated within existing resources. Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. Effective Date The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. State Appropriations For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $200,000 to the Department of Public Health and Environment, and 0.1 FTE. State and Local Government Contacts Higher Education Law Public Health and Environment The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.