Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB128 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/04/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0894.01 Caroline Martin x5902
SENATE BILL 24-128
Senate Committees House Committees
Transportation & Energy Transportation, Housing & Local Government
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE REPEAL OF AN OBSOLETE PROVISION THAT101
REQUIRED THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION TO MAKE102
RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY BY 2011.103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Statutory Revision Committee. The bill repeals an obsolete
provision that required the department of transportation to study mobility
improvement possibilities for the interstate 70 mountain corridor and to
make prioritized recommendations to the transportation committees of the
house of representatives and the senate by no later than December 20,
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 4, 2024
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
April 3, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 21, 2024
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 20, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Hinrichsen and Pelton B., Ginal, Rich
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Bradley and McLachlan, Pugliese, Epps, Jodeh, Willford
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. 2011.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, repeal 43-1-121 as2
follows:3
43-1-121.  Interstate 70 mountain corridor - recommendation4
regarding short-term mobility solutions. (1)  On or before December5
20, 2011, the department shall make prioritized recommendations to the6
transportation committees of the house of representatives and the senate7
regarding actions that can be taken on or before July 1, 2014, to improve8
mobility in the interstate 70 mountain corridor. Each recommendation9
shall include an estimate of the amount of funding required to implement10
the recommendation and shall recommend available or potentially11
available sources of such funding. In developing its recommendations, the12
department shall consider operational and safety improvement options,13
transit options, and traffic demand management options and shall14
investigate the feasibility of nongovernmental actions that might improve15
mobility in the corridor.16
(2)  The department shall consult with interested local17
governments and business entities that are located within the interstate 7018
mountain corridor or that have governmental or business interests that are19
likely to be substantially affected by any actions taken to improve20
mobility in the corridor and shall take such consultation into account21
when developing the recommendations required by subsection (1) of this22
section. The department may also hold public hearings at which interested23
members of the public may propose actions to improve mobility in the24
corridor or comment on any such actions proposed by others.25
128-2- SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act1
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the2
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except3
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V4
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this5
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take6
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in7
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the8
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.9
128
-3-