Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB128 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/04/2024

                    Page 1 
June 4, 2024  SB 24-128 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0894  
Sen. Hinrichsen; Pelton B. 
Rep. Bradley; McLachlan  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 4, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Colin Gaiser | 303-866-2677 
colin.gaiser@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: REPEAL CDOT 2011 RECOMMENDATION REQUIREMENT  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
No fiscal impact. The bill repeals outdated language in the Department of 
Transportation’s statutes. It is assessed as having no fiscal impact on state and local 
governments. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  
Summary of Legislation 
The bill repeals a requirement that the Department of Transportation (CDOT) study actions that 
could be taken on or before July 1, 2014, regarding mobility improvement possibilities for the 
Interstate 70 mountain corridor, and make prioritized recommendations to the General 
Assembly by December 20, 2011.  
Assessment of No Fiscal Impact 
The bill updates CDOT statute to eliminate an obsolete provision. This results in no change to 
state or local government revenue or expenditures. For this reason, the bill is assessed as having 
no fiscal impact. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on April 19, 2024, and takes effect on 
August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Transportation  
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.