Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB138 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/22/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0863.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
SENATE BILL 24-138
Senate Committees House Committees
Local Government & Housing Transportation, Housing & Local Government
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF101
LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES .102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Current law categorizes each county for purposes of establishing
the salaries of elected officers in the county. The statutory salary amounts
are adjusted every 2 years for inflation and take effect for terms
commencing after any change is made.
The bill modifies the categories of 3 counties which will result in
accompanying percentage increases in salary as follows:
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 22, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 22, 2024
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 21, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Simpson, Pelton R., Will, Winter F.
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Martinez and Catlin,
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Elbert county changes from category IV-A to category
III-A (17.7% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
assessors, clerks, and full-time coroners; 14.1% increase
for sheriffs; 50.0% increase for surveyors; 49.8% increase
for part-time coroners);
! Rio Grande county changes from category IV-C to category
III-C (17.7% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
assessors, clerks, and full-time coroners; 14.1% increase
for sheriffs; 50.0% increase for surveyors; 49.8% increase
for part-time coroners); and
! Hinsdale county changes from category V-B to category
V-A (8.3% increase for commissioners, treasurers,
assessors, clerks, sheriffs, surveyors, and part-time
coroners).
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend2
(1.5)(a)(II)(B), (1.5)(a)(III)(A), (1.5)(a)(III)(C), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A),3
(1.5)(a)(IV)(C), (1.5)(a)(V)(A), and (1.5)(a)(V)(B); and repeal4
(1.5)(a)(II)(C) as follows:5
30-2-102.  Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of6
county officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a)  For7
the purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of8
office begin on or after January 1, 2016:9
(II) (B) Category II-B counties consist of the county COUNTIES of10
FREMONT AND Pitkin.11
(C)  Category II-C counties consist of the county of Fremont.12
(III) (A)  Category III-A counties consist of the counties of13
Archuleta, Chaffee, Clear Creek, Delta, E
LBERT, Gunnison, Moffat,14
Montezuma, Montrose, Morgan, Ouray, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel,15
and Teller;16
(C)  Category III-C counties consist of the counties of Las Animas,17	138-2- RIO GRANDE, and Otero;1
(IV) (A)  Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,2
Elbert, and Prowers;3
(C)  Category IV-C counties consist of the counties of Huerfano4
Rio Grande, and Yuma;5
(V) (A)  Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,6
Conejos, Costilla, H
INSDALE, Lincoln, Mineral, Phillips, Saguache, and7
San Juan;8
(B)  Category V-B counties consist of the counties
 COUNTY of9
Crowley; and Hinsdale10
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act11
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the12
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except13
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V14
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this15
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take16
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in17
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the18
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.19
138
-3-