Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB164 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/14/2024

                    Page 1 
March 11, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0660  
Sen. Buckner; Lundeen 
Rep. McCluskie; Pugliese  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 13, 2024 
Senate Education  
John Armstrong | 303-866-6289 
john.armstrong@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION TRANSPARENCY REQUIREMENTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill modifies processes regarding credit transfers between institutions of higher 
education and requires students to receive certain cost information. The bill will 
increase expenditures for the state and institutions of higher education beginning in 
FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill makes changes to state law related to transfer of college credit between institutions of 
higher education. 
Student rights. The bill adds certain rights to students enrolled in postsecondary institutions, 
including: 
 transparency of the cost of postsecondary education; 
 seamless transfer of general education and transfer pathway courses; 
 transparency regarding if credits are accepted or rejected from an institution; and, 
 the ability to appeal an institution’s decision not to accept transfer credits. 
The Department of Higher Education (CDHE) must consult with a representative from each 
institution to create policies to implement the rights listed above for students. These policies 
must be adopted by April 1, 2025, and submitted to the Commission on Higher Education for 
approval.  
Council of Higher Education Representatives. The bill requires the Council of Higher 
Education Representatives (council) to add representatives to ensure equal representation of 
institutions, and to annually review the list of general education courses, guaranteed transfer 
pathway courses, and enrollment and transfer activity.  Page 2 
March 11, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
The bill clarifies that students who have completed a general education course defined in the 
state’s transfer pathway matrix must receive credit from the institutions receiving the transfer, 
regardless of the total number of credits assigned to the course. Institutions may not require 
additional lower-division general education courses for these students. 
Data reporting. Beginning January 2026, and annually thereafter, CDHE must include as part of 
its annual SMART Act hearing certain information regarding credit transfers, disaggregated by 
specific demographic categories. 
Violations of transfer policy. The bill grants CDHE the authority to enforce violations of 
transfer policies against institutions and overturn a course transfer decision made by an 
institution.   
Appeals process. CDHE must develop an appeal process for students who are denied transfer 
of credits in consultation with institutions of higher education. Appeals decisions must be 
completed within ninety days.  
Acceptance of transfer credits. Institutions must provide notice to students regarding the 
acceptance or denial of transfer credits within 30 days after the credit transfer is requested. 
Institutions must submit to CDHE their process for reviewing transfer credit applications by 
October 31, 2024, and, beginning November 1, 2024, the reason for any denial of transfer 
credits.  
Cost disclosures. Finally, the bill requires institutions to provide additional information to 
students regarding higher education costs and financial aid, and CDHE must report to the 
General Assembly on institution denials of transfer credits. 
Background 
The Council of Higher Education Representatives, established in 2001, consists of representatives 
from institutions of higher education and staff from the CDHE. The council meets periodically to 
establish common course numberings, classify certain courses as general education courses, and 
jointly develop the statewide transfer pathways matrix, which allows institutions to map which 
courses can be accepted for credit when students transfer.   
State Expenditures 
CDHE will have increased workload to convene members of the council to update transfer 
policies, make modifications to the Student Unit Record Data System (SURDS) to accept new 
information, adopt rules for institutional violations of transfer policy, develop an appeal process 
for students who have been denied transfer credits, and ensure accurate reporting of the new 
required data elements. Staff from CDHE will have increased workload to accomplish these 
activities and review student appeals of denied credit and issue rulings to institutions. Current 
staff are expected to be able to accomplish these activities within existing resources. 
  Page 3 
March 11, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
Initially, the number of appeals of denied credit transfers is expected to be minimal. As 
knowledge of the appeals process grows among institutions and students, appeals may increase 
in following years. If CDHE requires more staff to handle these appeals, they will be requested 
through the annual budget process.  
Institutions of Higher Education   
Institutions will have increased costs beginning in FY 2024-25 to implement the new 
requirements for transfer students, allow students to appeal decisions, and make required 
upgrades to data reporting systems. The fiscal note assumes these costs will be funded through 
adjustments to institutional tuition, fees, and other revenue sources. The General Assembly may 
also consider a General Fund appropriation for these costs in initial years.   
Annual costs will vary depending on the size of the institution, as follows: 
 smaller institutions—$77,000 to $400,000; 
 medium-sized institutions—$183,000 to $692,000; and  
 large institutions—$573,000 to $1.6 million 
 
Institutional costs include: 
 one-time expenses to upgrade data reporting systems;  
 staff to make decisions on accepting transfer credits in a condensed 30-day time frame; 
 including additional information in financial aid disclosures to students;  
 training on new requirements;  
 additional documentation of transfer credit decisions; and,  
 reporting required information to the SURDS.  
 
Staffing costs will vary considerably based on the size of the institution and the number of 
transfer students they accept.  
Technical Note 
The bill requires transfer information to be reported to CDHE disaggregated by income and 
disability status. While institutions have income information for their students who complete the 
Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA), these data are often not integrated into other 
data reporting systems. Additionally, institutions do not have the ability to report disability 
status for their students unless the student discloses this information. The fiscal note assumes 
that as much data as possible will be submitted, but that there may be incomplete or missing 
data for some fields.  
The bill’s safety clause will require CDHE and the institutions to immediately develop the appeal 
process for denied credit transfer. Because the council will need to meet to standardize this 
process, the appeal process is likely to be available beginning January 1, 2025, to allow the 
required time to refine the appeal process for students and institutions.  
   Page 4 
March 11, 2024  SB 24-164 
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature. 
Departmental Difference 
Several institutions of higher education indicated the need for a General Fund appropriation in 
order to implement the bill. These costs ranged from $305,000 and 3.5 FTE to $3.6 million and 
16.0 FTE in FY 2024-25. The fiscal note assumes that these additional requirements can be met 
using institutional revenue. Ultimately, this funding decision is at the discretion of the General 
Assembly. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Higher Education  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.