Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB170 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/29/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
INTRODUCED
 
 
LLS NO. 24-0990.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
SENATE BILL 24-170
Senate Committees House Committees
State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE AMERICA 250 - COLORADO 150 COMMISSION.101
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill adds the following 4 members to the America 250 -
Colorado 150 commission (commission), to be appointed by the
governor:
! 2 members representing Indigenous communities who are
members of a federally recognized tribe with historic ties
to Colorado that is not the Ute Mountain Ute Tribe or the
Southern Ute Indian Tribe;
! One member representing military and veterans affairs; and
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Zenzinger and Kirkmeyer,
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McLachlan,
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! One at-large member.
The bill also directs the commission and history Colorado to hold
any gifts, grants, or donations in the America 250 - Colorado 150 cash
fund (cash fund). The bill modifies the cash fund so that all money in the
cash fund may be used to support the following duties of the commission:
! Providing community grants to communities across the
state to assist recipient communities with providing local
opportunities related to commemoration of the 250th
anniversary of the founding of the United States and the
150th anniversary of Colorado statehood; and
! Developing and promoting plans for statewide recognition
of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United
States and the 150th anniversary of Colorado statehood
between July 1, 2025, and December 31, 2026, including
but not limited to:
! Historical activities;
! The creation and publication of historical
documents;
! Cooperation with agencies responsible for the
preservation or restoration of historic sites,
buildings, art, and artifacts;
! Educational opportunities for Colorado youth to
understand their historic roots in the United States
and Colorado;
! The promotion of scholarship and research that
illuminates the history of the American west and
Colorado within the larger story of the United
States;
! The arrangement of appropriate public ceremonies;
and
! Commemorative events, supported by a
comprehensive marketing and tourism campaign.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-80-215, amend2
(3)(a) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI)(F),3
(3)(a)(VI)(G), (3)(b), and (8); amend as added by House Bill 24-12094
(8.5)(a) and (8.5)(c); and add (3)(a)(VI)(H), (3)(a)(VI)(I), and5
(3)(a)(VI)(J) as follows:6
24-80-215.  America 250 - Colorado 150 commission - creation7
SB24-170-2- - powers and duties - report - definitions - repeal. (3)  Membership1
and appointments. (a)  The commission consists of fifteen NINETEEN2
voting members as follows:3
(VI)  Ten FOURTEEN members appointed by the governor, as4
follows:5
(F)  One member with experience in the study and documentation6
of the history of Asian American communities in Colorado; and7
(G)  Four members determined by the governor, in the governor's8
discretion, to enhance and expand the expertise of the commission with9
regards to its duties as set forth in subsection (4) of this section. TWO10
MEMBERS WHO ARE COLORADO RESIDENTS REPRESENTING INDIGENOUS11
COMMUNITIES, AS DEFINED IN SECTION 24-33.5-2601 (2), AND WHO ARE12
MEMBERS OF A FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBE WITH HISTORIC TIES TO13
C
OLORADO THAT IS NOT THE UTE MOUNTAIN UTE TRIBE OR THE14
S
OUTHERN UTE INDIAN TRIBE;15
(H)  O
NE MEMBER REPRESENTING MILITARY AND VETERANS16
AFFAIRS;17
(I)  O
NE AT-LARGE MEMBER; AND18
(J)  F
OUR MEMBERS DETERMINED BY THE GOVERNOR , IN THE19
GOVERNOR'S DISCRETION, TO ENHANCE AND EXPAND THE EXPERTISE OF20
THE COMMISSION WITH REGARDS TO ITS DUTIES AS SET FORTH IN21
SUBSECTION (4) OF THIS SECTION.22
(b)  The governor shall make appointments to the commission as23
set forth in subsections (3)(a)(VI)(A) to (3)(a)(VI)(F) of this section on24
or before September 1, 2022. The governor shall make appointments to25
the commission as set forth in subsection (3)(a)(VI)(G)
 SUBSECTION26
(3)(a)(VI)(J) of this section on or before October 1, 2023. T
HE GOVERNOR27
SB24-170
-3- SHALL MAKE APPOINTMENTS TO THE COMMISSION AS SET FORTH IN1
SUBSECTIONS (3)(a)(VI)(G) TO (3)(a)(VI)(I) OF THIS SECTION NOT LATER2
THAN THIRTY DAYS AFTER THE EFFECTIVE DATE OF THIS SENATE BILL3
24-____,
 ENACTED IN 2024. In making appointments, the governor shall4
attempt to ensure that the members represent the geographic diversity of5
the state.6
(8)  Gifts, grants, and donations. History Colorado and the7
commission may seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from8
private or public sources for the purposes of this section. H
ISTORY9
C
OLORADO AND THE COMMISSION SHALL TRANSMIT ALL MONEY RECEIVED10
THROUGH GIFTS, GRANTS, OR DONATIONS TO THE STATE TREASURER, WHO11
SHALL CREDIT THE MONEY TO THE FUND .12
(8.5) Cash fund. (a)  The America 250 - Colorado 150 cash fund13
is created in the state treasury. The fund consists of earned revenue from14
the sale of commemorative items sold in connection with the15
commission's marketing authority set forth in subsection (4)(a)(I)(G)
16
SUBSECTION (4) of this section that is received and credited to the fund17
pursuant to this subsection (8.5); 
GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS18
RECEIVED BY THE COMMISSION OR HISTORY COLORADO PURSUANT TO19
SUBSECTION (8) OF THIS SECTION; and any other money that the general20
assembly may appropriate or transfer to the fund.21
(c)  Money in the fund is continuously appropriated to the22
commission through history Colorado for the purpose
 PURPOSES of23
ACCOMPLISHING THE DUTIES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (4)(a)(I) OF THIS24
SECTION AND providing community grants to communities across the state25
to assist recipient communities with providing local opportunities related26
to commemoration of the two hundred fiftieth anniversary of the founding27
SB24-170
-4- of the United States and the one hundred fiftieth anniversary of Colorado1
statehood such as those set forth in subsection (4)(a)(II) of this section.2
Money in the fund may also be used by the commission for the purpose3
of administering, implementing, and effectuating the community grants.4
SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,5
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate6
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for7
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state8
institutions.9
SB24-170
-5-