Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB170 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/01/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
ENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 24-0990.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
SENATE BILL 24-170
Senate Committees House Committees
State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE AMERICA 250 - COLORADO 150 COMMISSION.101
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill adds the following 4 members to the America 250 -
Colorado 150 commission (commission), to be appointed by the
governor:
! 2 members representing Indigenous communities who are
members of a federally recognized tribe with historic ties
to Colorado that is not the Ute Mountain Ute Tribe or the
Southern Ute Indian Tribe;
! One member representing military and veterans affairs; and
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
April 1, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Zenzinger and Kirkmeyer,
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McLachlan,
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! One at-large member.
The bill also directs the commission and history Colorado to hold
any gifts, grants, or donations in the America 250 - Colorado 150 cash
fund (cash fund). The bill modifies the cash fund so that all money in the
cash fund may be used to support the following duties of the commission:
! Providing community grants to communities across the
state to assist recipient communities with providing local
opportunities related to commemoration of the 250th
anniversary of the founding of the United States and the
150th anniversary of Colorado statehood; and
! Developing and promoting plans for statewide recognition
of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United
States and the 150th anniversary of Colorado statehood
between July 1, 2025, and December 31, 2026, including
but not limited to:
! Historical activities;
! The creation and publication of historical
documents;
! Cooperation with agencies responsible for the
preservation or restoration of historic sites,
buildings, art, and artifacts;
! Educational opportunities for Colorado youth to
understand their historic roots in the United States
and Colorado;
! The promotion of scholarship and research that
illuminates the history of the American west and
Colorado within the larger story of the United
States;
! The arrangement of appropriate public ceremonies;
and
! Commemorative events, supported by a
comprehensive marketing and tourism campaign.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-80-215, amend2
(3)(a) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI)(F),3
(3)(a)(VI)(G), (3)(b), and (8); amend as added by House Bill 24-12094
(8.5)(a) and (8.5)(c);      
 add (3)(a)(VI)(H), (3)(a)(VI)(I), (3)(a)(VI)(J),5
and (3)(a)(VI)(K); and add to (8.5) as added by House Bill 24-12096
(8.5)(f) as follows:7
170-2- 24-80-215.  America 250 - Colorado 150 commission - creation1
- powers and duties - report - definitions - repeal. (3)  Membership2
and appointments. (a)  The commission consists of fifteen TWENTY3
voting members as follows:4
(VI)  Ten FIFTEEN members appointed by the governor, as follows:5
(F)  One member with experience in the study and documentation6
of the history of Asian American communities in Colorado; and7
(G)  Four members determined by the governor, in the governor's8
discretion, to enhance and expand the expertise of the commission with9
regards to its duties as set forth in subsection (4) of this section. TWO10
MEMBERS WHO ARE COLORADO RESIDENTS REPRESENTING INDIGENOUS11
COMMUNITIES, AS DEFINED IN SECTION 24-33.5-2601 (2), AND WHO ARE12
MEMBERS OF A FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBE WITH HISTORIC TIES TO13
C
OLORADO THAT IS NOT THE UTE MOUNTAIN UTE TRIBE OR THE14
S
OUTHERN UTE INDIAN TRIBE;15
(H)  O
NE MEMBER REPRESENTING MILITARY AND VETERANS16
AFFAIRS;17
(I)  O
NE MEMBER WHO IS AN EXPERT IN DISABILITY HISTORY OR IS
18
WORKING FOR A DISABILITY RIGHTS ORGANIZATION ;19
(J) ONE AT-LARGE MEMBER; AND20
(K) FOUR MEMBERS DETERMINED BY THE GOVERNOR , IN THE21
GOVERNOR'S DISCRETION, TO ENHANCE AND EXPAND THE EXPERTISE OF22
THE COMMISSION WITH REGARDS TO ITS DUTIES AS SET FORTH IN23
SUBSECTION (4) OF THIS SECTION.24
(b)  The governor shall make appointments to the commission as25
set forth in subsections (3)(a)(VI)(A) to (3)(a)(VI)(F) of this section on26
or before September 1, 2022. The governor shall make appointments to27
170
-3- the commission as set forth in subsection (3)(a)(VI)(G) SUBSECTION1
(3)(a)(VI)(K) of this section on or before October 1, 2023. THE2
GOVERNOR SHALL MAKE APPOINTMENTS TO THE COMMISSION AS SET3
FORTH IN SUBSECTIONS (3)(a)(VI)(G) TO (3)(a)(VI)(J) OF THIS SECTION4
NOT LATER THAN THIRTY DAYS AFTER THE EFFECTIVE DATE OF       SENATE5
B
ILL 24-170,
 ENACTED IN 2024. In making appointments, the governor6
shall attempt to ensure that the members represent the geographic7
diversity of the state.8
(8)  Gifts, grants, and donations. History Colorado and the9
commission may seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from10
private or public sources for the purposes of this section. H
ISTORY11
C
OLORADO AND THE COMMISSION SHALL TRANSMIT ALL MONEY RECEIVED12
THROUGH GIFTS, GRANTS, OR DONATIONS PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION
13
(8) TO THE STATE TREASURER, WHO SHALL CREDIT THE MONEY TO THE14
FUND.15
(8.5) Cash fund. (a)  The America 250 - Colorado 150 cash fund16
is created in the state treasury. The fund consists of earned revenue from17
the sale of commemorative items sold in connection with the18
commission's marketing authority set forth in subsection (4)(a)(I)(G)19
SUBSECTION (4) of this section that is received and credited to the fund20
pursuant to this subsection (8.5); 
GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS21
RECEIVED BY THE COMMISSION OR HISTORY COLORADO PURSUANT TO22
SUBSECTION (8) OF THIS SECTION; and any other money that the general23
assembly may appropriate or transfer to the fund.24
(c)  Money in the fund is continuously appropriated to the25
commission through history Colorado for the purpose
 PURPOSES of26
ACCOMPLISHING THE DUTIES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (4)(a)(I) OF THIS27
170
-4- SECTION AND providing community grants to communities across the state1
to assist recipient communities with providing local opportunities related2
to commemoration of the two hundred fiftieth anniversary of the founding3
of the United States and the one hundred fiftieth anniversary of Colorado4
statehood such as those set forth in subsection (4)(a)(II) of this section.5
Money in the fund may also be used by the commission for the purpose6
of administering, implementing, and effectuating the community grants.7
(f)  O
N JULY 1, 2024, THE STATE TREASURER SHALL TRANSFER TWO
8
HUNDRED FIFTY THOUSAND DOLLARS FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE9
FUND.10
SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,11
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate12
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for13
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state14
institutions.15
170
-5-