Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB170 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/07/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0990.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348
SENATE BILL 24-170
Senate Committees House Committees
State, Veterans, & Military Affairs State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE AMERICA 250 - COLORADO 150 COMMISSION.101
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill adds the following 4 members to the America 250 -
Colorado 150 commission (commission), to be appointed by the
governor:
! 2 members representing Indigenous communities who are
members of a federally recognized tribe with historic ties
to Colorado that is not the Ute Mountain Ute Tribe or the
Southern Ute Indian Tribe;
! One member representing military and veterans affairs; and
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
May 7, 2024
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
May 6, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 2, 2024
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
April 1, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Zenzinger and Kirkmeyer, Bridges, Buckner, Coleman, Cutter, Exum, Fenberg, Fields,
Gardner, Hansen, Jaquez Lewis, Lundeen, Marchman, Michaelson Jenet, Pelton B., Pelton
R., Priola, Rich, Simpson, Will
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McLachlan and Bird, Boesenecker, Lindstedt, Marshall, Martinez, Mauro, McCluskie,
McCormick, Parenti, Snyder, Titone, Valdez, Velasco, Willford
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! One at-large member.
The bill also directs the commission and history Colorado to hold
any gifts, grants, or donations in the America 250 - Colorado 150 cash
fund (cash fund). The bill modifies the cash fund so that all money in the
cash fund may be used to support the following duties of the commission:
! Providing community grants to communities across the
state to assist recipient communities with providing local
opportunities related to commemoration of the 250th
anniversary of the founding of the United States and the
150th anniversary of Colorado statehood; and
! Developing and promoting plans for statewide recognition
of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United
States and the 150th anniversary of Colorado statehood
between July 1, 2025, and December 31, 2026, including
but not limited to:
! Historical activities;
! The creation and publication of historical
documents;
! Cooperation with agencies responsible for the
preservation or restoration of historic sites,
buildings, art, and artifacts;
! Educational opportunities for Colorado youth to
understand their historic roots in the United States
and Colorado;
! The promotion of scholarship and research that
illuminates the history of the American west and
Colorado within the larger story of the United
States;
! The arrangement of appropriate public ceremonies;
and
! Commemorative events, supported by a
comprehensive marketing and tourism campaign.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-80-215, amend2
(3)(a) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI)(F),3
(3)(a)(VI)(G), (3)(b), and (8); amend as added by House Bill 24-12094
(8.5)(a) and (8.5)(c);      
 add (3)(a)(VI)(H), (3)(a)(VI)(I), (3)(a)(VI)(J),5
and (3)(a)(VI)(K); and add to (8.5) as added by House Bill 24-12096
(8.5)(f) as follows:7
170-2- 24-80-215.  America 250 - Colorado 150 commission - creation1
- powers and duties - report - definitions - repeal. (3)  Membership2
and appointments. (a)  The commission consists of fifteen TWENTY-ONE 3
voting members as follows:4
(VI)  Ten SIXTEEN members appointed by the governor, as5
follows:6
(F)  One member with experience in the study and documentation7
of the history of Asian American communities in Colorado; and8
(G)  Four members determined by the governor, in the governor's9
discretion, to enhance and expand the expertise of the commission with10
regards to its duties as set forth in subsection (4) of this section. TWO11
MEMBERS WHO ARE COLORADO RESIDENTS REPRESENTING INDIGENOUS12
COMMUNITIES, AS DEFINED IN SECTION 24-33.5-2601 (2), AND WHO ARE13
MEMBERS OF A FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBE WITH HISTORIC TIES TO14
C
OLORADO THAT IS NOT THE UTE MOUNTAIN UTE TRIBE OR THE15
S
OUTHERN UTE INDIAN TRIBE;16
(H)  O
NE MEMBER REPRESENTING MILITARY AND VETERANS17
AFFAIRS;18
(I)  O
NE MEMBER WHO IS AN EXPERT IN DISABILITY HISTORY OR IS
19
WORKING FOR A DISABILITY RIGHTS ORGANIZATION ;20
(J) TWO AT-LARGE MEMBERS; AND21
(K) FOUR MEMBERS DETERMINED BY THE GOVERNOR , IN THE22
GOVERNOR'S DISCRETION, TO ENHANCE AND EXPAND THE EXPERTISE OF23
THE COMMISSION WITH REGARDS TO ITS DUTIES AS SET FORTH IN24
SUBSECTION (4) OF THIS SECTION.25
(b)  The governor shall make appointments to the commission as26
set forth in subsections (3)(a)(VI)(A) to (3)(a)(VI)(F) of this section on27
170
-3- or before September 1, 2022. The governor shall make appointments to1
the commission as set forth in subsection (3)(a)(VI)(G) SUBSECTION2
(3)(a)(VI)(K) of this section on or before October 1, 2023. THE3
GOVERNOR SHALL MAKE APPOINTMENTS TO THE COMMISSION AS SET4
FORTH IN SUBSECTIONS (3)(a)(VI)(G) TO (3)(a)(VI)(J) OF THIS SECTION5
NOT LATER THAN THIRTY DAYS AFTER THE EFFECTIVE DATE OF       SENATE6
B
ILL 24-170,
 ENACTED IN 2024. In making appointments, the governor7
shall attempt to ensure that the members represent the geographic8
diversity of the state.9
(8)  Gifts, grants, and donations. History Colorado and the10
commission may seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from11
private or public sources for the purposes of this section. H
ISTORY12
C
OLORADO AND THE COMMISSION SHALL TRANSMIT ALL MONEY RECEIVED13
THROUGH GIFTS, GRANTS, OR DONATIONS PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION
14
(8) TO THE STATE TREASURER, WHO SHALL CREDIT THE MONEY TO THE15
FUND.16
(8.5) Cash fund. (a)  The America 250 - Colorado 150 cash fund17
is created in the state treasury. The fund consists of earned revenue from18
the sale of commemorative items sold in connection with the19
commission's marketing authority set forth in subsection (4)(a)(I)(G)20
SUBSECTION (4) of this section that is received and credited to the fund21
pursuant to this subsection (8.5); 
GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS22
RECEIVED BY THE COMMISSION OR HISTORY COLORADO PURSUANT TO23
SUBSECTION (8) OF THIS SECTION; and any other money that the general24
assembly may appropriate or transfer to the fund.25
(c)  Money in the fund is continuously appropriated to the26
commission through history Colorado for the purpose
 PURPOSES of27
170
-4- ACCOMPLISHING THE DUTIES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (4)(a)(I) OF THIS1
SECTION AND providing community grants to communities across the state2
to assist recipient communities with providing local opportunities related3
to commemoration of the two hundred fiftieth anniversary of the founding4
of the United States and the one hundred fiftieth anniversary of Colorado5
statehood such as those set forth in subsection (4)(a)(II) of this section.6
Money in the fund may also be used by the commission for the purpose7
of administering, implementing, and effectuating the community grants.8
(f)  O
N JULY 1, 2024, THE STATE TREASURER SHALL TRANSFER TWO
9
HUNDRED FIFTY THOUSAND DOLLARS FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE10
FUND.11
SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,12
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate13
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for14
the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state15
institutions.16
170
-5-