Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB178 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/08/2024

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 24-0405.01 Nicole Myers x4326
SENATE BILL 24-178
Senate Committees House Committees
State, Veterans, & Military Affairs State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE REPEAL OF A DUPLICATIVE REQUIREMENT TO101
MAINTAIN AN INVENTORY OF NONDEVELOPED STATE -OWNED102
REAL PROPERTY.103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Capital Development Committee. Current law requires each state
agency and state institution of higher education to annually submit to the
capital development committee (committee) a list of all nondeveloped
real property owned by or under the control of the agency or institution
(nondeveloped real property list). The committee is required to include
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 8, 2024
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
April 5, 2024
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 27, 2024
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 26, 2024
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Hinrichsen and Simpson, Mullica, Zenzinger
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Story and Lindsay, Catlin, Epps, Mabrey
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. the information from the nondeveloped real property list in an annual
report, and the division of housing within the department of local affairs
is required to post a link to the report on the division's website.
Current law also requires the department of personnel to maintain
and annually update an inventory of unused state-owned real property and
to post a list of the inventory on its website. The department of personnel
may request the nondeveloped real property list as a basis for its inventory
but is required to independently ascertain the inventory for its purposes.
The information collected, maintained, updated, and posted as
required by these laws is duplicative. To address this, the bill repeals the
statutory provisions that require the annual submittal to the committee and
posting of the nondeveloped real property list and the provision that
allows the department of personnel to request the nondeveloped real
property list for its inventory of unused state-owned real property.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1304, repeal (3)2
as follows:3
2-3-1304.  Powers and duties of capital development committee4
- definition. (3) (a)  Not later than October 15, 2019, each state agency
5
and state institution of higher education shall submit to the capital6
development committee a list of all nondeveloped real property owned by7
or under the control of the agency or institution. Not later than October8
15 of each year thereafter, each agency or institution shall submit to the9
capital development committee any additions or deletions to the list10
identifying any nondeveloped real property the agency has acquired or11
disposed of during the preceding state fiscal year. The capital12
development committee shall include this information in an annual report13
published on the website of the general assembly. The division of housing14
within the department of local affairs shall provide a link to the report on15
the division's website. The division of parks and wildlife in the16
department of natural resources is exempt from the requirements of this17
178-2- subsection (3).1
(b)  For purposes of this subsection (3), "nondeveloped real2
property" means unimproved real property that is not otherwise protected3
for or dedicated to another use such as an access or a conservation4
easement.5
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-32-705, repeal (4)6
as follows:7
24-32-705.  Functions of division. (4)  On a page on the website8
maintained by the department of local affairs that is dedicated to the9
division of housing, the division shall provide a link to the annual report10
that includes information on nondeveloped real property owned by or11
under the control of each state agency or institution of higher education12
pursuant to section 2-3-1304 (3). Not later than once annually by13
December 31 of each year, the division shall update the link it is required14
to maintain by this subsection (4).15
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-82-102.5, repeal16
(3)(b) as follows:17
24-82-102.5.  Unused state-owned real property - cash fund -18
legislative declaration - definitions - repeal. (3) (b)  The department19
may request the list provided to the capital development committee under20
section 2-3-1304 (3) as a basis for the department's inventory, but the21
department shall independently ascertain the inventory for the22
department's purposes under this section.23
SECTION 4. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act24
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the25
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except26
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V27
178
-3- of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this1
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take2
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in3
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the4
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.5
178
-4-