Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB192 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/12/2024

                    Page 1 
April 12, 2024  SB 24-192 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1136  
Sen. Michaelson Jenet 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 12, 2024 
Senate Business, Labor, & Tech.  
Nina Forbes | 303-866-4785 
nina.forbes@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: MOTOR VEHICLE LEMON LAW  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill expands the state’s motor vehicle Lemon Law, including creating a “lemon law 
buyback and repair” title brand. It increases state expenditures in FY 2024-25 and 
FY 2025-26 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $19,605 to the Department of 
Revenue. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-192 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$19,605  $20,025  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
   Page 2 
April 12, 2024  SB 24-192 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, known as the “Lemon Law,” a vehicle manufacturer, manufacturer’s agent, or 
a manufacturer’s authorized dealer must replace or buy back a motor vehicle if the purchaser 
notified the dealer within the earlier of either the warranty period or one year after the original 
delivery of the vehicle and the vehicle underwent a reasonable number of repair attempts. 
Reasonable repair attempts mean the vehicle was out of service for repairs for a cumulative total 
of 30 or more business days or the dealer tried unsuccessfully to repair the vehicle four or more 
times. 
The bill expands the Lemon Law to: 
 cover vehicles affected by safety-based nonconformities; 
 lengthen the notification time to include the earlier of either the first 36,000 miles or three 
years after original delivery of the vehicle; 
 lengthen the statute of limitations to 42 months after the delivery of the vehicle; 
 lower the number of out-of-service business days from 30 to 21; 
 lower the number of required repair attempts from four to three; 
 clarify that the Lemon Law is not an affirmative defense against a consumer’s claim after it 
has been raised but before the threshold for cure has been met; 
 add a 10-day limit on the opportunity for a manufacture to cure the defect; 
 set a formula for determining the reasonable allowance for use deduction when a dealer 
buys back the vehicle; 
 clarify that vehicles exempt from the Lemon Law due to problems that do not affect the 
market value of the vehicle must not be problems affecting safety; 
 require a dealer to allow an agent of the purchaser to inspect the vehicle unless the dealer 
proves a 7-day free-look period in which the purchaser may return the vehicle and receive a 
full refund; and 
 require dealers to give certain notices that a vehicle was returned, including notifying the 
Department of Revenue (DOR). DOR must put a “lemon law buyback and repair” brand on 
the vehicle’s title to notify subsequent purchasers of the return. 
Background 
DRIVES programming. The Division of Motor Vehicles (DMV) in the DOR uses its Driver License, 
Record, Identification and Vehicle Enterprise Solution (DRIVES) information technology system 
for all driver license and motor vehicle transactions. The DRIVES system requires an extensive 
18-month upgrade which is scheduled to take place from July 1, 2024, through March 31, 2026. 
As a result, the DOR has requested that any new legislation requiring DRIVES programming have 
an effective date of April 1, 2026, with roll-forward spending authority through FY 2026-27, 
noting that each programming requirement during the system upgrade period may increase the 
overall project timeline. Based on the current effective date in the bill, the fiscal note includes 
costs for the DRIVES programming to take place twice—in the existing and new system. 
  Page 3 
April 12, 2024  SB 24-192 
 
 
 
State Expenditures 
Expenditures in DOR will increase by about $20,000 in both FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26, as 
shown in Table 2.  
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 24-192 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Revenue   
Computer Programming 	$19,605  $20,025  
Total Cost $19,605  $20,025  
 
Department of Revenue. The DOR will have costs to add the new title brand into the DRIVES 
system. Computer programming costs in FY 2024-25 and FY 2025-26 include DRIVES 
programming, estimated at 60 hours at a rate of $245 per hour in FY 2024-25 and 60 hours at a 
rate of $252 per hour in FY 2025-26; ISD development and testing costs, estimated at 44 hours 
at a rate of $35 per hour in each year; support from the Office of Information Technology 
estimated at 23 hours at a rate of $99 per hour in each year, paid to OIT through real-time 
billing; and business user acceptance testing at 34 hours at a rate of $32 per hour in each year. 
Technical Note 
The fiscal note currently includes a duplicative programming cost for the DOR’s DRIVES system, 
as discussed in the Background section. The duplicate cost would be removed if the bill’s 
effective date were amended to April 1, 2026, when the DRIVES upgrade is complete. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires an appropriation of $19,605 from the DRIVES Cash Fund to the 
Department of Revenue. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology      Revenue  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.