Colorado 2025 2025 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB015 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2025

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fifth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 25-0187.01 Caroline Martin x5902
SENATE BILL 25-015
Senate Committees House Committees
Agriculture & Natural Resources Agri culture, Water & Natural Resources
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING UPDATING THE WILDFIRE INFORMATION AND RESOURCE101
CENTER WEBSITE.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Wildfire Matters Review Committee. The division of fire
prevention and control is currently required to host the wildfire
information and resource center website and to provide information
regarding active wildfires on the website. The bill requires the website to
include hyperlinks to websites that display emergency information and
wildfire updates for each county in Colorado and requires the division to
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 26, 2025
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 25, 2025
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 25, 2025
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 24, 2025
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Cutter and Marchman, Amabile, Catlin, Coleman, Exum, Kipp, Liston, Michaelson Jenet,
Snyder, Winter F.
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Velasco and Mauro, Boesenecker, Bacon, Barron, Bird, Bradley, Brown, Caldwell,
Camacho, Carter, Clifford, Duran, English, Froelich, Garcia, Garcia Sander, Gonzalez R.,
Hamrick, Jackson, Johnson, Joseph, Keltie, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Lukens, Mabrey,
Marshall, Martinez, McCluskie, McCormick, Paschal, Pugliese, Ricks, Rutinel, Sirota, Smith,
Stewart K., Story, Suckla, Titone, Valdez, Weinberg
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. coordinate with county governments in order to provide the hyperlinks.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-33.5-1230, add2
(5) as follows:3
24-33.5-1230.  Wildfire information and resource center. (5)  I
N4
ADDITION TO THE REQUIREMENTS IN SUBSECTION (2)(b) OF THIS SECTION,5
THE CENTER'S WEBSITE MUST ALSO INCLUDE HYPERLINKS TO WEBSITES6
THAT DISPLAY EMERGENCY INFORMATION AND WILDFIRE UPDATES FOR7
EACH COUNTY IN COLORADO. THE DIVISION SHALL COORDINATE WITH8
COUNTY GOVERNMENTS IN ORDER TO PROVIDE THE HYPERLINKS REQUIRED9
BY THIS SUBSECTION (5).10
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act11
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the12
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except13
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V14
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this15
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take16
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in17
November 2026 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the18
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.19
015-2-