Connecticut 2010 2010 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00385 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/02/2010

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 385
February Session, 2010  LCO No. 1826
 *01826_______ENV*
Referred to Committee on Environment
Introduced by:
(ENV)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 385 

February Session, 2010

LCO No. 1826

*01826_______ENV*

Referred to Committee on Environment 

Introduced by:

(ENV)

AN ACT CREATING INCENTIVES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOLAR ENERGY AND OTHER RENEWABLE ENERGY RESOURCES.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-245a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2010):

(a) An electric supplier and an electric distribution company providing standard service or supplier of last resort service, pursuant to section 16-244c, shall demonstrate:

(1) On and after January 1, 2006, that not less than two per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(2) On and after January 1, 2007, not less than three and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(3) On and after January 1, 2008, not less than five per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(4) On and after January 1, 2009, not less than six per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(5) On and after January 1, 2010, not less than seven per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional three per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(6) On and after January 1, 2011, not less than eight per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(7) On and after January 1, 2012, not less than nine per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(8) On and after January 1, 2013, not less than ten per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(9) On and after January 1, 2014, not less than eleven per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(10) On and after January 1, 2015, not less than twelve and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(11) On and after January 1, 2016, not less than fourteen per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(12) On and after January 1, 2017, not less than fifteen and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(13) On and after January 1, 2018, not less than seventeen per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(14) On and after January 1, 2019, not less than nineteen and one-half per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources;

(15) On and after January 1, 2020, not less than twenty per cent of the total output or services of any such supplier or distribution company shall be generated from Class I renewable energy sources and an additional [three] five per cent of the total output or services shall be from Class I or Class II renewable energy sources.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2010 16-245a(a)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2010

16-245a(a)

Statement of Purpose: 

To encourage the development of solar power and other renewable energy sources. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]