Connecticut 2011 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05126 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/25/2011

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5126
January Session, 2011  LCO No. 2410
 *02410HB05126ENV*
Referred to Committee on Environment
Introduced by:
(ENV)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 5126 

January Session, 2011

LCO No. 2410

*02410HB05126ENV*

Referred to Committee on Environment 

Introduced by:

(ENV)

AN ACT INCREASING ANCHORAGE AND MOORING FEES PAID TO HARBOR MASTERS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 22a-113s of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2011):

(a) The commission may propose a fee schedule for a permit for a mooring or anchorage or any other activity within the scope of the plan to be adopted by vote of the legislative body of each town establishing the commission. The maximum annual fee for a mooring or anchorage shall be [two] four hundred dollars. The harbor master or deputy harbor master for the municipality shall collect such fee. Any fee collected pursuant to this section shall be deposited into a fund maintained by the municipality in which such fee was collected and shall be used for the maintenance and improvement of the harbor for the public and for expenses for personnel and equipment directly related to the function of the commission and the harbor master or deputy harbor master.

(b) Not later than April 1, 2012, the commission shall propose a fee schedule for a permit for a mooring or anchorage that is not less than ten per cent and not more than one hundred per cent greater than the applicable permit fee as of October 1, 2012. Such proposed fee schedule shall be implemented or rejected by the legislative body of each town establishing the commission not later than July 1, 2012. The amount of such increase shall be deposited into a fund maintained by the municipality in which such fee was collected and shall be used by such municipality as such municipality deems appropriate. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2011 22a-113s

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2011

22a-113s

Statement of Purpose: 

To increase anchorage and mooring fees paid to harbor masters and have such increase paid to the towns that bear the burden of such activities. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist. 

H.B. 5126