Connecticut 2011 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06528 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2011

                    General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6528
January Session, 2011  *_____HB06528CE____031711____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 6528 

January Session, 2011

*_____HB06528CE____031711____*

AN ACT CONCERNING BONDING FOR BROWNFIELDS. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) For the purposes described in subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the aggregate one hundred thirty million dollars, provided twenty-five million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2012; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2013; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2014; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2015; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2016; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2017; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2018; ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2019; and ten million dollars shall be effective July 1, 2020.

(b) The proceeds of the sale of said bonds, to the extent of the amount stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by the Department of Economic and Community Development for the purpose of providing funding to the Office of Brownfield Remediation and Development established pursuant to section 32-9cc of the general statutes to fund projects prioritized on the state-wide inventory developed pursuant to section 32-9cc of the general statutes, as amended by this act.

(c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise of any right or power granted thereby, which are not inconsistent with the provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this section, and temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in accordance with said section 3-20 and from time to time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond Commission authorizing such bonds. None of said bonds shall be authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that there has been filed with it a request for such authorization which is signed by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its discretion, may require. Said bonds issued pursuant to this section shall be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and interest on said bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as part of the contract of the state with the holders of said bonds, appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay such principal and interest as the same become due.

Sec. 2. Subsection (b) of section 32-9cc of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011): 

(b) The office shall:

(1) Develop procedures and policies for streamlining the process for brownfield remediation and development;

(2) Identify existing and potential sources of funding for brownfield remediation and develop procedures for expediting the application for and release of such funds; 

(3) Establish an office to provide assistance and information concerning the state's technical assistance, funding, regulatory and permitting programs;

(4) Provide a single point of contact for financial and technical assistance from the state and quasi-public agencies;

(5) Develop a common application to be used by all state and quasi-public entities providing financial assistance for brownfield assessment, remediation and development; [and]

(6) [Identify] Develop and prioritize a state-wide inventory of brownfield development opportunities, using priority criteria that includes, but is not limited to, economic development viability, geographic diversity and environmental urgency; and

(7) Develop and execute a communication and outreach program to educate municipalities, economic development agencies, property owners and potential property owners and other organizations and individuals with regard to state policies and procedures for brownfield remediation.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section
Sec. 2 July 1, 2011 32-9cc(b)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2011

New section

Sec. 2

July 1, 2011

32-9cc(b)

 

CE Joint Favorable Subst.

CE

Joint Favorable Subst.