General Assembly Raised Bill No. 366 January Session, 2011 LCO No. 915 *00915_______AGE* Referred to Committee on Aging Introduced by: (AGE) General Assembly Raised Bill No. 366 January Session, 2011 LCO No. 915 *00915_______AGE* Referred to Committee on Aging Introduced by: (AGE) AN ACT CONCERNING FUNDING FOR ADULT DAY CARE CENTERS. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 17b-343 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011): The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the maximum allowable rate to be paid by [said] agencies for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and June 30, 1993. The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly established under section 17b-342 shall constitute the rates required under this section until revised in accordance with this section. The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule, to be effective on and after July 1, 1994, for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The commissioner may annually increase any fee in the fee schedule based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, to establish a rate of payment of not less than seventy-five dollars per person, per day for adult day care services. Nothing contained in this section shall authorize a payment by the state to any agency for such services in excess of the amount charged by such agency for such services to the general public. This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2011 17b-343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2011 17b-343 Statement of Purpose: To increase rates paid to adult day care centers. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]