Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05475 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/18/2013

                    General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 5475
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 1445
Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
Introduced by:
REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist.

General Assembly

Proposed Bill No. 5475 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 1445

Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY 

Introduced by:

REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist.

AN ACT EXTENDING RENEWABLE PORTFOLIO STANDARD DEADLINES.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

That section 16-245a of the general statutes be amended to extend the existing renewable portfolio standard deadlines for an electric supplier and an electric distribution company providing standard service or supplier of last resort service as follows: (1) The January 1, 2016, deadline is extended to January 1, 2017; (2) the January 1, 2017, deadline is extended to January 1, 2019; (3) the January 1, 2018, deadline is extended to January 1, 2021; (4) the January 1, 2019, deadline is extended to January 1, 2023; and (5) the January 1, 2020, deadline is extended to January 1, 2025.

Statement of Purpose: 

To provide additional time for compliance with the renewable portfolio standard requirements by extending each deadline beginning in 2016.