General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6411 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 2837 *_____HB06411HS_APP030613____* Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES Introduced by: (HS) General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6411 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 2837 *_____HB06411HS_APP030613____* Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES Introduced by: (HS) AN ACT CONCERNING MEDICAID COVERAGE FOR CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013): (a) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include, on and after January 1, 2009, hospice services as optional services covered under the Medicaid program. Said state plan amendment shall supersede any regulations of Connecticut state agencies concerning such optional services. From January 1, 2013, to June 30, 2013, inclusive, hospice services covered under the Medicaid program for individuals who are residents in long-term care facilities shall be paid at a rate that is ninety-five per cent of the facility's per diem rate. (b) Effective July 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include foreign language interpreter services provided to any beneficiary with limited English proficiency as a covered service under the Medicaid program. Not later than July 1, 2013, the commissioner shall develop and implement the use of medical billing codes for foreign language interpreter services. (c) Effective July 1, 2013, the Department of Social Services shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, semi-annually, to the Council on Medical Assistance Program Oversight on the foreign language interpreter services provided to recipients of benefits under the program. (d) Not later than October 1, 2011, the Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include podiatry as an optional service under the Medicaid program. [(e) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to provide that chiropractic services shall be covered under the Medicaid program only to the extent required by federal law.] This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2013 17b-28e This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2013 17b-28e HS Joint Favorable C/R APP HS Joint Favorable C/R APP