Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06553 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2013

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6553
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 3564
 *03564_______LAB*
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
Introduced by:
(LAB)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 6553 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 3564

*03564_______LAB*

Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES 

Introduced by:

(LAB)

AN ACT ESTABLISHING A TASK FORCE TO STUDY FAMILY MEDICAL LEAVE INSURANCE.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) There is established a Task Force on Family Medical Leave Insurance. The task force shall study the feasibility of establishing an insurance program to provide short-term benefits to workers who are unable to work due to (1) pregnancy or the birth of a child, (2) a non-work-related illness or injury, or (3) the need to care for a seriously ill child, spouse or parent. 

(b) The task force shall consist of the following members: (1) The chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to labor and public employees; (2) the executive director of the Permanent Commission on the Status of Women, or said director's designee; (3) the Commissioner of Insurance, or said commissioner's designee; (4) the Labor Commissioner, or said commissioner's designee; (5) the State Comptroller, or said comptroller's designee; (6) three members of the public appointed by the Governor, one of whom represents an organization that advocates for the rights of persons with disabilities, one of whom represents an organization that advocates for infant health and one of whom represents an organization that advocates for individuals sixty-five years of age or older; (7) two members of the public appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate, one of whom represents an organization that provides legal services to low-income individuals and one of whom serves or has served in a care-giving institution, as defined in section 20-571 of the general statutes; (8) two members of the public appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives, one of whom represents an organization that advocates for individuals with chronic or acute illnesses and one of whom represents a labor organization; (9) two members of the public appointed by the majority leader of the Senate, one of whom represents an organization that provides medical care to working families and one of whom represents the insurance industry; (10) two members of the public appointed by the majority leader of the House of Representatives, one of whom represents an organization that advocates for working families and one of whom represents the interests of women-owned businesses; (11) two members of the public appointed by the minority leader of the Senate, one of whom represents an organization that provides temporary disability insurance and one of whom represents the interests of small businesses; and (12) two members of the public appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives, one of whom represents the interests of state businesses and one of whom represents the interests of parents.

(c) All appointments to the task force shall be made not later than July 31, 2013. Any vacancy shall be filled by the appointing authority.

(d) The executive director of the Permanent Commission on the Status of Women shall serve as the chairperson and schedule the first meeting of the task force, which shall be held not later than September 1, 2013. The Permanent Commission on the Status of Women shall provide any necessary support staff or services for the task force. 

(e) Not later than October 1, 2014, the task force shall submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to labor and public employees, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 

(f) The task force shall terminate on October 1, 2014.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To establish a task force to examine the feasibility of establishing a family medical leave insurance benefit. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]