Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06608 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2013

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6608
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 3385
 *03385_______HS_*
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
Introduced by:
(HS)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 6608 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 3385

*03385_______HS_*

Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES 

Introduced by:

(HS)

AN ACT CONCERNING AN INTEGRATED SYSTEM OF CARE.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) The Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council, established pursuant to section 17a-22j of the general statutes, shall, in consultation with the Departments of Social Services, Public Health, Mental Health and Addiction Services, Children and Families and Education, develop recommendations for an integrated system of care addressing the social, emotional, psychological, psychiatric and behavioral health services needs of state residents.

(b) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council shall conduct a study that includes, but is not limited to: (1) A projection of the need for social, emotional, psychological, psychiatric and behavioral health services for (A) children, (B) adults age eighteen years to fifty years, and (C) adults fifty years of age and older for the year commencing on January 1, 2014; (2) an inventory of existing services and inpatient psychiatric beds available compared to the projected need in the coming year by age group; (3) an analysis of barriers to care by age group; and (4) a comparison of services available in the private sector to those available to citizens receiving public assistance.

(c) Not later than July 1, 2014, the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services, insurance and public health concerning the integrated health system established pursuant to this section and public investment required to provide integrated services or expand access to care.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To establish an integrated system of social, emotional, behavioral, psychological and psychiatric health care for citizens of the state. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]