Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00063 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/07/2013

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 63
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 2787
 *02787SB00063PH_*
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH
Introduced by:
(PH)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 63 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 2787

*02787SB00063PH_*

Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH 

Introduced by:

(PH)

AN ACT CONCERNING GRANTS FROM THE BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST FUND FOR STROKE RESEARCH.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 19a-32c of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):

There is created a Biomedical Research Trust Fund which shall be a separate nonlapsing fund. The trust fund may accept transfers from the Tobacco Settlement Fund and may apply for and accept gifts, grants or donations from public or private sources to enable the account to carry out its objectives. On and after July 1, 2001, the Commissioner of Public Health may make grants-in-aid from the trust fund to eligible institutions for the purpose of funding biomedical research in the fields of heart disease, cancer and other tobacco-related diseases, [and]  Alzheimer's disease, stroke and diabetes. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2002, the total amount of such grants-in-aid made during the fiscal year shall not exceed two million dollars. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2003, and each fiscal year thereafter, the total amount of such grants-in-aid made during the fiscal year shall not exceed fifty per cent of the total amount held in the trust fund as of the date such grants-in-aid are approved. Not later than April 1, 2001, the Commissioner of Public Health shall develop an application for grants-in-aid under this section and may receive applications from eligible institutions for such grants-in-aid on and after said date. For purposes of this section, "eligible institution" means (1) a nonprofit, tax-exempt academic institution of higher education, or (2) a hospital that conducts biomedical research. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 19a-32c

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

19a-32c

Statement of Purpose: 

To provide funding through the Biomedical Research Trust Fund to researchers investigating stroke. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: SEN. CRISCO, 17th Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

SEN. CRISCO, 17th Dist. 

S.B. 63