Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00530 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/21/2013

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 530
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 4984
 *04984SB00530CE_*
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
Introduced by:
(CE)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 530 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 4984

*04984SB00530CE_*

Referred to Committee on COMMERCE 

Introduced by:

(CE)

AN ACT CONCERNING ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT APPROPRIATIONS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 31-3kk of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):

Any funds appropriated to the Labor Department for incumbent worker training programs shall be administered by [regional workforce development boards] the Labor Commissioner and such programs shall be implemented by the regional workforce development boards. Not later than October 1, 2015, and annually thereafter, the Labor Commissioner shall submit a report, in accordance with section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and labor on the expenditure of such funds and the outcomes of such programs for companies and their employees. 

Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2013) The sum of five hundred thousand dollars is appropriated to the Labor Department from the General Fund, for each of the fiscal years ending June 30, 2014, and June 30, 2015, for the incumbent worker training programs. Any funds appropriated for the 21st Century Jobs program for said fiscal years shall be included in the Incumbent Worker Training account of the Labor Department.

Sec. 3. (Effective July 1, 2013) The sum of one million five hundred thousand dollars is appropriated to the Department of Economic and Community Development, from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, for the purpose of providing a grant-in-aid to the Consortium of Connecticut Art Museums in order to fund its operations.

Sec. 4. (Effective July 1, 2013) The sum of ten million dollars is appropriated to the Department of Economic and Community Development, from the General Fund, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, for the purpose of providing a grant-in-aid to the town of Preston and the city of Norwich to remediate and redevelop the Norwich State Hospital property.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 31-3kk
Sec. 2 July 1, 2013 New section
Sec. 3 July 1, 2013 New section
Sec. 4 July 1, 2013 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

31-3kk

Sec. 2

July 1, 2013

New section

Sec. 3

July 1, 2013

New section

Sec. 4

July 1, 2013

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To provide funding for the Consortium of Connecticut Art Museums, the redevelopment of the Norwich State Hospital property and the Labor Department's incumbent worker training programs, and to require the Labor Department to provide an annual report concerning the expenditure of such funds. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: SEN. GERRATANA, 6th Dist.; SEN. STILLMAN, 20th Dist. SEN. MAYNARD, 18th Dist.; SEN. BYE, 5th Dist. SEN. HARTLEY, 15th Dist.; REP. RITTER E., 38th Dist. REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.; REP. CAFERO, 142nd Dist. REP. CANDELORA, 86th Dist.; REP. KLARIDES, 114th Dist. REP. BOWLES, 42nd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

SEN. GERRATANA, 6th Dist.; SEN. STILLMAN, 20th Dist.

SEN. MAYNARD, 18th Dist.; SEN. BYE, 5th Dist.

SEN. HARTLEY, 15th Dist.; REP. RITTER E., 38th Dist.

REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.; REP. CAFERO, 142nd Dist.

REP. CANDELORA, 86th Dist.; REP. KLARIDES, 114th Dist.

REP. BOWLES, 42nd Dist. 

S.B. 530

H.B. 6267