Connecticut 2013 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00619 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/12/2013

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 619
January Session, 2013  LCO No. 4455
 *04455SB00619CE_*
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
Introduced by:
(CE)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 619 

January Session, 2013

LCO No. 4455

*04455SB00619CE_*

Referred to Committee on COMMERCE 

Introduced by:

(CE)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE COMMISSION ON CONNECTICUT'S FUTURE.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 32-245 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):

(a) There is created a [Connecticut Commission on Business Opportunity, Defense Diversification and Industrial Policy which] Commission on Connecticut's Future that shall be within the Department of Economic and Community Development for administrative purposes only.

(b) The commission shall consist of the following members: The Commissioners of Economic and Community Development, Education and Higher Education and the Labor Commissioner or their designees; the chairpersons and ranking members of the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce, [and exportation,] or their designees; the president of the Connecticut Academy of Science and Engineering, or his designee; the president of the Connecticut Business and Industries Association or his designee; the president of the Connecticut AFL-CIO or his designee; one member representing a large manufacturing concern and one member representing a financial institution, appointed by the president pro tempore of the Senate; one member representing a large business that is heavily dependent on prime defense contracts or subcontracts and one member representing a small business that is heavily dependent on prime defense contracts or subcontracts appointed by the speaker of the House of Representatives; one member representing a small manufacturing concern appointed by the majority leader of the Senate; one member representing a large service-related business appointed by the majority leader of the House of Representatives; one member representing a small service-related business appointed by the minority leader of the Senate; and one member representing an educational institution appointed by the minority leader of the House of Representatives. The members who are not serving ex-officio shall serve for a term of two years, commencing July 1, 1990, and biennially thereafter, and until their successors have been duly qualified. The Governor shall appoint a chairperson for the commission from its membership. The chairperson shall call a meeting of the commission not later than October 1, 2013, and at such other times as the chairperson deems necessary. 

(c) The commission shall [develop a plan for] prepare a report concerning the economic renewal of Connecticut [. The plan] that shall include strategies for (1) the restoration and growth of manufacturing in the state, with the objective of ending the loss of manufacturing jobs and causing an increase in such jobs within five years following [development of the plan] preparation of the report; (2) the retention and expansion of the state's economic base industries; (3) the coordination of economic development policy with capital investment in both public and private sectors; [and (4) the need for regional approaches to economic development in the state] (4) the alignment of the state's educational institutions with its manufacturing base; and (5) the diversification or conversion of defense-related industries. On or before December 1, 2014, the commission shall submit such report to the Governor and, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce.

(d) In addition to the [development of a plan] preparation of a report for economic renewal as required under subsection (c) of this section, the commission shall: (1) Advise the General Assembly and the Department of Economic and Community Development on issues relating to (A) the diversification or conversion of defense-related industries, (B) planning for and development of the state's manufacturing base; (C) creation and implementation of an industrial policy for the state; and (D) the creation of a business climate in the state conducive to long-term planning and capital investment; (2) evaluate legislation which concerns the state's economy and the overall competitiveness thereof, the manufacturing and industrial sectors of the state's economy and businesses that are heavily dependent on prime defense contracts or subcontracts; (3) prepare and review the implementation of short-term and long-term strategies to assist businesses that are heavily dependent on prime defense contracts or subcontracts in modifying defense industry technology production capacity into nondefense related applications; (4) provide a forum to address and communicate business issues, including small business issues, to the public and private sectors; (5) foster opportunities for the development of partnerships between government and private enterprise in areas that significantly affect the state's economy; and (6) stimulate and review public and private assistance and initiatives to improve the competitiveness of Connecticut's economy. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 32-245

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

32-245

Statement of Purpose: 

To update the Commission on Connecticut's Future and require the commission to meet by October 1, 2013, and produce a report by December 1, 2014. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: SEN. HARP, 10th Dist.; SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist. REP. HOLDER-WINFIELD, 94th Dist.; REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist. REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.; REP. DILLON, 92nd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

SEN. HARP, 10th Dist.; SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.

REP. HOLDER-WINFIELD, 94th Dist.; REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist.

REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.; REP. DILLON, 92nd Dist. 

S.B. 619