General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1138 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 4707 *04707_______ET_* Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY Introduced by: (ET) General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1138 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 4707 *04707_______ET_* Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY Introduced by: (ET) AN ACT CONCERNING CONNECTICUT'S CLEAN ENERGY GOALS. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subdivision (44) of subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): (44) "Class III source" means the electricity output from combined heat and power systems with an operating efficiency level of no less than fifty per cent that are part of customer-side distributed resources developed at commercial and industrial facilities in this state on or after January 1, 2006, a waste heat recovery system installed on or after April 1, 2007, that produces electrical or thermal energy by capturing preexisting waste heat or pressure from industrial or commercial processes, or the electricity savings created in this state from conservation and load management programs begun on or after January 1, 2006, provided on and after January 1, 2014, no such programs supported by ratepayers or auction revenues from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative shall be eligible under this subdivision; Sec. 2. Section 16-245a of the general statutes is amended by adding subsection (h) as follows (Effective from passage): (NEW) (h) On or after March 31, 2013, the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, in consultation with the electric distribution companies and the procurement manager, may solicit, in conjunction with other states in the ISO-New England region, or on the commissioner's own, proposals from providers of electric resources classified as Class I renewable energy sources in accordance with the definition of Class I renewable energy sources, pursuant to subdivision (26) of subsection (a) of section 16-1, as of January 1, 2013. In the event the commissioner finds any such proposals to be in the interest of ratepayers and consistent with the energy goals of the state, the commissioner shall report such finding, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the Governor and the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to energy and technology. Such report shall also evaluate whether such renewable energy resources are consistent with the policy goals outlined in the Comprehensive Energy Strategy, including, but not limited to, peak load shaving and promotion of wind, solar and other renewable energy technologies. This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 from passage 16-1(a)(44) Sec. 2 from passage 16-245a This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 from passage 16-1(a)(44) Sec. 2 from passage 16-245a Statement of Purpose: To allow the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to solicit proposals from providers of Class I renewable energy sources and report findings of such study to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to energy and technology. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]