Connecticut 2014 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05298 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/19/2014

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5298
February Session, 2014  LCO No. 1358
 *01358_______VA_*
Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
Introduced by:
(VA)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5298 

February Session, 2014

LCO No. 1358

*01358_______VA_*

Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS 

Introduced by:

(VA)

AN ACT CONCERNING ACTIVE SERVICE PAY FOR MEMBERS OF THE CONNECTICUT NATIONAL GUARD.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 27-61a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2014):

(a) As used in this section, "eligible member or veteran" means a member or former member of the Connecticut National Guard who (1) is or was called to active service on or after September 11, 2001, (2) is or was in such active service for at least ninety consecutive days, and (3) if discharged, is or was honorably discharged or discharged for injuries sustained in the line of duty. 

(b) (1) On and after July 1, 2005, and prior to July 1, 2014, the Adjutant General shall pay each eligible member or veteran the amount of fifty dollars for each month or major part thereof of active service by such eligible member or veteran on or after September 11, 2001. On and before June 30, 2007, the maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran shall not exceed five hundred dollars.

(2) On and after July 1, 2007, and prior to July 1, 2014, the maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran under this subsection shall not exceed five hundred dollars, except that such maximum payment shall not exceed one thousand two hundred dollars if, during such active service, such eligible member or veteran is or was deployed to an area designated as a combat zone by the President of the United States. 

(3) On and after July 1, 2014, the Adjutant General shall pay each eligible member or veteran the amount of one hundred dollars for each month or major part thereof of active service by such eligible member or veteran. The maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran under this subdivision shall not exceed one thousand dollars, except that such maximum payment shall not exceed one thousand four hundred dollars if, during such active service, such eligible member or veteran is or was deployed to an area designated as a combat zone by the President of the United States.

[(3)] (4) No payment shall be made under this subsection to any eligible member or veteran who makes application for such payment later than three years after the date of the cessation of such [operations in which such member or veteran served] active service. 

(c) The Adjutant General, in consultation with the Commissioner of Veterans' Affairs, shall adopt regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54, to implement the provisions of this section. Such regulations shall include procedures for verification of eligibility of an eligible member or veteran and for the application for and payment of the amounts specified in this section. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2014 27-61a

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2014

27-61a

Statement of Purpose: 

To update and increase the active service pay for members of the Connecticut National Guard. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]