Connecticut 2014 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05534 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2014

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5534
February Session, 2014  LCO No. 2289
 *02289_______PH_*
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH
Introduced by:
(PH)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5534 

February Session, 2014

LCO No. 2289

*02289_______PH_*

Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH 

Introduced by:

(PH)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS WITH INTELLECTUAL DISABILITIES.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective October 1, 2014) (a) On or before July 1, 2015, the Commissioner of Developmental Services shall develop a plan, in consultation with (1) individuals who receive services from the Department of Developmental Services, (2) family members of such individuals, (3) members of organizations that advocate for such individuals, (4) persons who provide services to such individuals, and (5) representatives of labor organizations for persons who provide services to such individuals to ensure that each person with intellectual disability who is eligible to receive services from the department, including an individual currently on a waiting list to receive services from the department, receives such services not later than July 1, 2016. Such services shall include, but need not be limited to, community-based residential services, respite care, emergency care, day program services, vocational services and in-home support services. Such plan shall include: (A) A description of additional staffing and facilities that the department anticipates are likely to be required to provide the services described in this subsection; (B) the amount of the appropriation required to provide such services; (C) a description of any Medicaid waiver that is likely to be required to provide such services; (D) a description of additional resources that are likely to be required to provide such services; and (E) a timeline for implementing the plan on or before July 1, 2016. Not later than January 1, 2016, the commissioner shall submit the plan, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, human services and appropriations and the budgets of state agencies.

(b) Not later than July 1, 2016, the Commissioner of Developmental Services shall provide each person with intellectual disability who is eligible to receive services from the department with the services described in subsection (a) of this section for which the individual is eligible, in accordance with the plan submitted under subsection (a) of this section.

(c) The services provided in accordance with this section shall not result in a reduction of other services offered by the Department of Developmental Services, a reduction in pay or benefits to employees of the department or employees of organizations receiving funding under a contract with the department to provide services for persons with intellectual disabilities.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2014 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2014

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To require the Department of Developmental Services to provide certain services to individuals with intellectual disabilities. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]